Scroos LLC et al v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Scroos LLC, Brigette Katz, Yael katz and Reece Katz
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Kathy Baran, Chad F. Wolf, Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director of California Service Center, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 6:2020cv00689
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 Interested persons order by Brigette Katz, Reece Katz, Scroos LLC, Yael katz identifying Corporate Parent Scroos, SA for Brigette Katz, Reece Katz, Scroos LLC, Yael katz.. (Pilehvar, Taymoor)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #12 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Brigette Katz, Reece Katz, Scroos LLC, Yael katz. Related case(s): yes (Pilehvar, Taymoor)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/24/2020. (RMF)ctp
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/8/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/24/2020. (RMF)ctp
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/8/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/24/2020. (RMF)ctp
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF of service by Brigette Katz, Reece Katz, Scroos LLC, Yael katz (Pilehvar, Taymoor)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Brigette Katz, Yael katz, Reece Katz, Scroos LLC. Director of California Service Center served on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Pilehvar, Taymoor)
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Brigette Katz, Yael katz, Reece Katz, Scroos LLC. Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Pilehvar, Taymoor)
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Brigette Katz, Yael katz, Reece Katz, Scroos LLC. Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Pilehvar, Taymoor)
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Brigette Katz, Yael katz, Reece Katz, Scroos LLC. Attorney General of the United States served on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Pilehvar, Taymoor)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF of service by Brigette Katz, Reece Katz, Scroos LLC, Yael katz (Pilehvar, Taymoor)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 (INCORRECT EVENT USED. ATTORNEY TO REFILE.) PROOF of service by Brigette Katz, Reece Katz, Scroos LLC, Yael katz (Pilehvar, Taymoor) Modified text on 4/24/2020 (LDJ).
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Attorney General of the United States, Director of California Service Center, and U.S. Attorney. (LDJ)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-689-Orl-78LRH. (SJB)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Taymoor M. Pilehvar on behalf of Brigette Katz, Reece Katz, Scroos LLC, Yael katz (Pilehvar, Taymoor)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT under the APA against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16723413) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27 (Request for Evidence), #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41 (denial notice), #43 Civil Cover Sheet JS44, #44 Proposed Summons)(Pilehvar, Taymoor) Modified text on 4/22/2020 (LDJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scroos LLC et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scroos LLC
Represented By: Taymoor M. Pilehvar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brigette Katz
Represented By: Taymoor M. Pilehvar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yael katz
Represented By: Taymoor M. Pilehvar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reece Katz
Represented By: Taymoor M. Pilehvar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of California Service Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?