Omega Patents, LLC v. DEI Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Omega Patents, LLC
Defendant: DEI Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00693
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice #12 Motion for Clerk's Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/9/2020. (MKH)
June 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Clerk's Default against DEI Holdings, Inc. by Omega Patents, LLC. (Gilchrist, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on May 15, 2020 by Omega Patents, LLC as to DEI Holdings, Inc.. (Gilchrist, Brian)
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Omega Patents, LLC. (Gilchrist, Brian)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Omega Patents, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gilchrist, Brian) Modified on 5/8/2020 (DMA).
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MKH)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/24/2020. (MEH) ctp
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of Interested Persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/8/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/24/2020. (MEH) ctp
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/8/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/24/2020. (MEH) ctp
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint & Exhibits Part 1, #2 Complaint & Exhibits Part 2, #3 Complaint & Exhibits Part 3) (DMA)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to DEI Holdings, Inc.. (DMA)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-693-Orl-41LRH. (SJB)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEI Holdings, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16727465) filed by Omega Patents, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent RE47,225, #2 Exhibit B - US Patent 8,032,278, #3 Exhibit C - US Patent RE47,354, #4 Exhibit D - US Patent 8,362,886, #5 Exhibit E - US Patent 9,981,615, #6 Exhibit F - US Patent 7,305,293, #7 Exhibit G - US Patent 8,410,929, #8 Exhibit H - US Patent 8,258,948, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons)(Gilchrist, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omega Patents, LLC v. DEI Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEI Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omega Patents, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?