Bootes v. InvestorsHub.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jefferson A. Bootes
Defendant: ADVN Plc., InvestorsHub.com, Inc. and Unknown Party
Case Number: 6:2020cv00740
Filed: April 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proof of Libel by Jefferson A. Bootes (KNC)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/28/2020. (RMF)ctp
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER VACATING #7 Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The order was entered in error. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/5/2020. (JLE)
May 1, 2020 Reset deadlines/hearings: Amended Complaint due by 5/22/2020 (ARJ)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER taking under advisement #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/1/2020. (JLE)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/1/2020. (RMF)ctp
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/15/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/1/2020. (RMF)ctp
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/15/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/1/2020. (RMF)ctp
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER taking under advisement #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/1/2020. (JLE)
April 28, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Jefferson A. Bootes. (RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Jefferson A. Bootes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bootes v. InvestorsHub.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson A. Bootes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVN Plc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InvestorsHub.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?