Blue Water Innovations, LLC v. Vevazz, LLC
Plaintiff: BLUE WATER INNOVATIONS, LLC
Defendant: VEVAZZ, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00774
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 06/02/2020 by Blue Water Innovations, LLC as to Vevazz, LLC. (Gigliotti, Louis)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re: #5 Related Case Order by Blue Water Innovations, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Gigliotti, Louis) Modified on 6/2/2020 (KNC).
June 1, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Blue Water Innovations, LLC. (Gigliotti, Louis)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (RN)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/18/2020. (RMF)ctp
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/1/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/18/2020. (RMF)ctp
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/1/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/18/2020. (RMF)ctp
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (LDJ)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Vevazz, LLC. (LDJ)
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:20-cv-774-Orl-78DCI. (SJB)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for patent infringement against Vevazz, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16771682) filed by Blue Water Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit to cover sheet/re-file from dismissed case, #4 Proposed Summons)(Gigliotti, Louis) Modified text on 5/5/2020 (LDJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Water Innovations, LLC v. Vevazz, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUE WATER INNOVATIONS, LLC
Represented By: Louis Raymond Gigliotti, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VEVAZZ, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?