Henegar et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: TONY HENEGAR and CHI HENEGAR
Defendant: Erick Yglesias, Wilbur Davis, Jr., United States of America and Health Care Center for the Homeless, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00812
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 19 Remark: Doc. #18 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/1/20. (MT)
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #16 Order directing compliance, #5 Interested persons order by Chi Henegar, Tony Henegar. (Henry, Sharon)
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re: #16 Order Directing Compliance; #4 Related Case Order by Chi Henegar, Tony Henegar. Related case(s): No (Henry, Sharon) Modified on 6/1/2020 (KNC).
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing compliance to #4 Related Case Order, #5 Interested Persons Order. Responses due by 6/11/2020. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/28/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
May 18, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS issued as to United States of America. (KNC)
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS issued as to Wilbur Davis, Jr., Health Care Center for the Homeless, Inc., Erick Yglesias. (KNC)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Chi Henegar, Tony Henegar. (Henry, Sharon)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Chi Henegar, Tony Henegar. (Henry, Sharon)
May 15, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Chi Henegar, Tony Henegar. (Henry, Sharon)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Chi Henegar, Tony Henegar. (Henry, Sharon)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (RN)
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. New case number: 6:20-cv-812-ORL-37DCI. Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER reassigning this case to another District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 5/12/2020. (SC)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint by Chi Henegar, Tony Henegar (Henry, Sharon) Modified on 5/11/2020 (SPM).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 5/11/2020. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 5/11/2020. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Sharon Jablonski Henry of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPM)
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:20-cv-812-Orl-18DCI. (SJB)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16793303) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Henry, Sharon) Modified on 5/11/2020 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henegar et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erick Yglesias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Center for the Homeless, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY HENEGAR
Represented By: Sharon Jablonski Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHI HENEGAR
Represented By: Sharon Jablonski Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?