Interstellar Productions, Incorporated d/b/a Eyecon v. Bush
Plaintiff: Interstellar Productions, Incorporated d/b/a Eyecon
Defendant: Sophia Bush
Case Number: 6:2020cv00950
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 28 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Mediator: Clem Hyland (KNC)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/14/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 9/14/2020, Discovery due by 4/30/2021, Dispositive motions due by 5/31/2021, Pretrial statement due by 9/6/2021, All other motions due by 9/13/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 1/26/2021, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 2/26/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.., Conduct mediation hearing by 3/31/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/28/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
July 29, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state a claim filed by Sophia Bush. (Partlow, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/30/2020 (KNC).
July 22, 2020 Set deadlines: Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss due by 7/29/2020. (KNC)
July 22, 2020 Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Partlow, Jeffrey)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #23 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Defendant may file a reply not to exceed seven (7) pages on or before Wednesday, July 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/21/2020. (MT)
July 21, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :A Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Sophia Bush. (Crowley, Melissa)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER discharging the Court's July 8, 2020 Order to Show Cause (Doc. #20) in light of Plaintiff's response (Doc. #21). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/15/2020. (MT)
July 15, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #20 Order to show cause filed by Interstellar Productions, Incorporated d/b/a Eyecon. (Smith, Richard)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Interstellar Productions, Incorporated d/b/a Eyecon. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by written response on or before Wednesday, July 15, 2020 why the Court should not strike the response (Doc. 19) as untimely. Failure to timely do so will result in the Court striking the response and considering the motion as unopposed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/8/2020. (GNB) ctp
July 6, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state a claim filed by Interstellar Productions, Incorporated d/b/a Eyecon. (Smith, Richard)
June 26, 2020 Set deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state a claim. Plaintiff's Response due by 7/3/2020 (KNC)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER discharging the Court's June 25, 2020 Order to Show Cause (Doc. #14) in light of Plaintiff's response (Doc. #15). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/25/2020. (MT)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's response is due on or before Friday, July 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/25/2020. (MT)
June 25, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state a claim by Interstellar Productions, Incorporated d/b/a Eyecon. (Smith, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 25, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #14 Order to show cause filed by Interstellar Productions, Incorporated d/b/a Eyecon. (Smith, Richard)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by written response on or before Wednesday, July 1, 2020 why it failed to timely respond. With the response, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to respond to the Motion (Doc. 7). Failure to timely do so may result in the Court granting the Motion as unopposed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/24/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 Remark: Doc. #12 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/22/20. (MT)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Interstellar Productions, Incorporated d/b/a Eyecon. (Smith, Richard)
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Interstellar Productions, Incorporated d/b/a Eyecon. Related case(s): yes (Smith, Richard)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 Remark: Doc. #8 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/16/20. (MT)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sophia Bush. Related case(s): N (Partlow, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/16/2020 (KNC).
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Sophia Bush. (Partlow, Jeffrey)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state a claim by Sophia Bush. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sophia Bush)(Partlow, Jeffrey)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Discovery Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/8/2020. (MB)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/19/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/5/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/19/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/5/2020. (BIA)(ctp)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-950-Orl-37GJK. (SJB)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 2020-CA-2264-O filed in State Court on 02/27/2020. (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 113A-16877122) filed by Sophia Bush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Crowley, Melissa) Modified on 6/4/2020 to correct docket text (SJB). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2020: #5 State Court Amended Complaint filed in Orange County Court on 5/6/2020) (MAA).
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE by Sophia Bush Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Crowley, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interstellar Productions, Incorporated d/b/a Eyecon v. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sophia Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interstellar Productions, Incorporated d/b/a Eyecon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?