Morsch v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Williams Morsch
Defendant: Elaine Meister, Jeff McClung, Krystal Bingham, Ellen Ziemba, Virginia Piazza, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Gladys Jackson and Washington Mutual Bank
Case Number: 6:2020cv00983
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot #8 Motion for Summary Judgment in light of #20 Order remanding Plaintiff's claims to the Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/30/2020. (JBS)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants are hereby REMANDED to the Ninth Judicial Circuit Court in and for Orange County, Florida. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of Court for the Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate any pending deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/30/2020. (JBS)
July 10, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Jennifer Williams Morsch of Selection of Mediator (Beregovich, Andres)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing the parties to confer and advise the Court on the selection of a mediator within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/10/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
July 10, 2020 Filing 17 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. No mediator appointed at this time. (RDO)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Joinder of Parties due by 9/29/2020, Discovery due by 3/1/2021, Dispositive motions due by 4/1/2021, Pretrial statement due by 9/21/2021, All other motions due by 9/28/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 3/1/2021, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 4/1/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2021 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron., Conduct mediation hearing by 5/15/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/9/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Beregovich, Andres)
June 25, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jennifer Williams Morsch. (Beregovich, Andres) Modified on 6/26/2020 (SPM). Modified on 7/7/2020 (MEJ).
June 24, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Krystal Bingham, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Gladys Jackson, Jeff McClung, Elaine Meister, Virginia Piazza, Ellen Ziemba. (Herron, Andrew)
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Krystal Bingham, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Gladys Jackson, Jeff McClung, Elaine Meister, Virginia Piazza, Ellen Ziemba identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Herron, Andrew)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Jennifer Williams Morsch identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for Jennifer Williams Morsch.. (Beregovich, Andres)
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jennifer Williams Morsch. Related case(s): yes (Beregovich, Andres)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Krystal Bingham, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Gladys Jackson, Jeff McClung, Elaine Meister, Virginia Piazza, Ellen Ziemba. Related case(s): YES (Herron, Andrew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Herron, Andrew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jennifer Williams Morsch. (Beregovich, Andres)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. (PML) ctp
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/9/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/9/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-983-Orl-40EJK. (SJB)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Service by Krystal Bingham, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Gladys Jackson, Jeff McClung, Elaine Meister, Virginia Piazza, Ellen Ziemba re #1 Notice of Removal (Herron, Andrew) Modified on 6/8/2020 (MEJ).
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2020-CA-004709-0 filed in State Court on 05/05/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16902535 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 State Court Docket Sheet, #7 State Court Other Documents)(Herron, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morsch v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Meister
Represented By: Andrew Ross Herron
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff McClung
Represented By: Andrew Ross Herron
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krystal Bingham
Represented By: Andrew Ross Herron
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Ziemba
Represented By: Andrew Ross Herron
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Piazza
Represented By: Andrew Ross Herron
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew Ross Herron
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladys Jackson
Represented By: Andrew Ross Herron
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank
Represented By: Andrew Ross Herron
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Williams Morsch
Represented By: Andres I. Beregovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?