Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC v. Eposnow, LLC
Plaintiff: Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC
Defendant: Eposnow, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00990
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER TO DEFENDANT Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/19/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/5/2020. (MEH) ctp
August 5, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE to counsel Neil J. Nabnay, Ricardo J. Bonilla, Noel Chakkalakal of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk).(ctp) (SPM)
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC by Eposnow, LLC.(Barnett, Eleanor)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Eposnow, LLC. (Barnett, Eleanor)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 Rule 7.1 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Eposnow, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Epos Now Limited for Eposnow, LLC.. (Barnett, Eleanor) Modified on 8/5/2020 (SPM).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FILED ON BEHALF OF ATTORNEY JAY B. JOHNSON, provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/31/2020. (MB)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Jay B. Johnson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17124975 for $150 by Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scott, Cathleen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 7/14/2020 by Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC as to Eposnow, LLC. (Scott, Cathleen)
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC. (Scott, Cathleen)
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC. Related case(s): yes (Scott, Cathleen)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/10/2020. (MB)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/9/2020. (MEH) ctp
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of Interested Persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/23/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/9/2020. (MEH) ctp
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/23/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/9/2020. (MEH) ctp
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Eposnow, LLC. (SPM)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Ex. A) (SPM)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-990-Orl-41GJK. (SJB)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eposnow, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16907836) filed by Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Summons)(Scott, Cathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC v. Eposnow, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eposnow, LLC
Represented By: Eleanor Trotman Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?