Old Hickory, LLC v. Mattress Firm, Inc.
Plaintiff: Old Hickory, LLC
Defendant: Mattress Firm, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01000
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER dismissing case re #14 Notice of settlement, #15 Stipulation of Dismissal. All pending motions are denied as moot and the clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/1/2020. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC)
July 1, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Mattress Firm, Inc.. (Lopez, Kimberly)
June 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of settlement by Mattress Firm, Inc. (Lopez, Kimberly)
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by Old Hickory, LLC. (RDO)
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 (WRONG EVENT CODE. REFILED AT #13) NOTICE by Old Hickory, LLC Plaintiff's Certificate of Interesdet persons and corporate Disclosure Statement (Delaney, Suzanne) Modified on 6/26/2020 (RDO).
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #4 Related Case Order by Old Hickory, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Delaney, Suzanne) Modified on 6/26/2020 (RDO).
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by Mattress Firm, Inc.. (Lopez, Kimberly)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Mattress Firm, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Lopez, Kimberly)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to counsel Christian J. Gendreau of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ)
June 22, 2020 Set deadline for Mattress Firm, Inc. Answer due by 6/30/2020. (LDJ)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint on or before June 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/22/2020. (MDH)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's State Court Complaint by Mattress Firm, Inc.. (Lopez, Kimberly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne Victoria Delaney on behalf of Old Hickory, LLC (Delaney, Suzanne)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing for both Plaintiff and Defendant. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/25/2020. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/25/2020. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 6/11/2020. (copy mailed to plaintiff's counsel/defendant's emailed)(AKC)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Mattress Firm, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Filing Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal)(Lopez, Kimberly)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-1000-Orl-22LRH. (SJB)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Osceola County, Florida, case number 2020 CA 001348 filed in State Court on 5/14/20. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16914986 filed by Mattress Firm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lopez, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old Hickory, LLC v. Mattress Firm, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattress Firm, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly A. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Hickory, LLC
Represented By: Christian J. Gendreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?