United States of America v. $39,422 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $39,422 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 6:2020cv01184
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Muench on behalf of United States of America (Muench, James)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 VERIFIED CLAIM STATEMENT of Right or Interest by $39,422 in U.S. Currency. (Morris, Robert) Modified on 8/18/2020 (RDO).
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF of service by United States of America (Andrejko, Nicole)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 the United State's Motion for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest In Rem. The Clerk is directed to sign the proposed warrant, attached to the Motion, and return the original signed warrant to the United States Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 7/7/2020. (JLE)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/7/2020. (LAM)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): no (RDO)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant In Rem by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant)(RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against $39,422 in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $39,422 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $39,422 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Robert Alexander Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole M. Andrejko
Represented By: James A. Muench
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?