Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. McGann et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Takiyah McCann, Q's Lounge LLC d/b/a The New Q's, Takiyah McGann and Q's Lounge LLC doing business as The New Q's
Case Number: 6:2020cv01264
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #9 Amended Complaint (FILED PRO SE) by Takiyah McGann.(MAA)
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed on 7/25/2020 as to Takiyah McGann by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Giles, Brian) Modified on 7/29/2020 (KNC).
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 Remark: Doc. #8 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/22/20. (MT)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (KNC)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Giles, Brian)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Takiyah McGann, Q's Lounge LLC filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Giles, Brian)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Giles, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020.(MDH)
July 17, 2020 Set deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 7/23/2020 (KNC)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. On or before Thursday, July 23, 2020, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint correcting the deficiency identified in this Order. Failure to timely file will result in closure of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/16/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/30/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/16/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/30/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/16/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (KNC)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-1264-Orl-37LRH. (SJB)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Takiyah McCann, Q's Lounge LLC d/b/a The New Q's (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17061749) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giles, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. McGann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takiyah McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q's Lounge LLC d/b/a The New Q's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takiyah McGann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q's Lounge LLC doing business as The New Q's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Brian T. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?