Kingdom Life Now, Inc v. Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kingdom Life Now, Inc
Defendant: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv01269
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Mawhinney, Joseph)
September 3, 2020 Set deadline: Amended Complaint due by 9/17/2020 (LDJ)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Plaintiff's Opposition #12 is STRICKEN. Defendant's Motion toDismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #3 is GRANTED. The Complaint (Doc. 1-7) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before September 17, 2020. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/3/2020. (RMF)ctp
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Telephonically at the Case Management Conference. However, the Motion was unnecessary in the Orlando Division. See https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/locations/orlando (March 18, 2020 Orlando Covid Protocols Memorandum). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/20/2020. (Irick, Daniel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for J. Pace Mawhinney to appear telephonically at Case Management Conference by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Mawhinney, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 8/20/2020 (LDJ).
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 (STRICKEN per Order #15) MEMORANDUM in opposition re #3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Kingdom Life Now, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Boltz, Brooke) Modified text on 9/4/2020 (LDJ).
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Mawhinney, Joseph) Modified link on 8/10/2020 (LDJ).
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons by Axis Surplus Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Axis Surplus Insurance Company, Corporate Parent AXIS Capital Holdings Limited., Corporate Parent Axis Insurance Company (Illinois), Corporate Parent Axis Specialty U.S. Holdings, Inc. (Delaware) for Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Mawhinney, Joseph) Modified link on 8/10/2020 (LDJ).
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Kingdom Life Now, Inc. (Boltz, Brooke)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kingdom Life Now, Inc. Related case(s): No (Boltz, Brooke) Modified text on 7/31/2020 (LDJ).
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (RN)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/27/2020. (RMF)ctp
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/10/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/27/2020. (RMF)ctp
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/10/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/27/2020. (RMF)ctp
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mawhinney, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
July 22, 2020 REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number 113A-17071738 refunded in the amount of $ 400.00 paid to Joseph Mawhinney.. (NLC)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:20-cv-1269-Orl-78DCI. (SJB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Volusia County Circuit Court, case number 2020-30855 CICI filed in State Court on 6/18/2020. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number 113A-17071836) filed by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 State Court COMPLAINT, #8 State Court Other Documents, #9 State Court Other Documents, #10 State Court Other Documents, #11 State Court Other Documents)(Mawhinney, Joseph) Modified text on 7/20/2020 (LDJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kingdom Life Now, Inc v. Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingdom Life Now, Inc
Represented By: Brooke M. Boltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph Pace Mawhinney, II
Represented By: William Roderick Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?