All Underwriters Subscribing to International Risk Solutions US (IRSUS) Policy of Insurance ASU 00481100 et al v. Southern Marine Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: FSB Sailing, LLC and All Underwriters Subscribing to International Risk Solutions US (IRSUS) Policy of Insurance ASU 00481100
Defendant: Southern Marine Services, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01274
Filed: July 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER. Upon consideration of the #10 Response to order to show cause, it is ORDERED that the #7 Order to show cause is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/12/2020. (LAM)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 Order to show cause filed by All Underwriters Subscribing to International Risk Solutions US (IRSUS) Policy of Insurance ASU 00481100, FSB Sailing, LLC. (Bayer, Neil)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by All Underwriters Subscribing to International Risk Solutions US (IRSUS) Policy of Insurance ASU 00481100. Related case(s): No (Bayer, Neil)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by All Underwriters Subscribing to International Risk Solutions US (IRSUS) Policy of Insurance ASU 00481100. (Bayer, Neil)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Plaintiffs to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed, which may include dismissal of this case, for failure to respond to the Related Case Order and Interested Persons Order. Show Cause Response due by 8/25/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/11/2020. (LAM)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (RN)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/4/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/21/2020. (LAM)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/4/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/21/2020. (LAM)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Southern Marine Services, Inc.. (RDO)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:20-cv-1274-Orl-31DCI. (SJB)
July 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Southern Marine Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17073007) filed by All Underwriters Subscribing to International Risk Solutions US (IRSUS) Policy of Insurance ASU 00481100, FSB Sailing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to Southern Marine Services, Inc.)(Bayer, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All Underwriters Subscribing to International Risk Solutions US (IRSUS) Policy of Insurance ASU 00481100 et al v. Southern Marine Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FSB Sailing, LLC
Represented By: Neil E Bayer
Represented By: Chase Alexandra Jansson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Underwriters Subscribing to International Risk Solutions US (IRSUS) Policy of Insurance ASU 00481100
Represented By: Neil E Bayer
Represented By: Chase Alexandra Jansson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Marine Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?