Shell Trademark Management Inc. et al v. LLB Convenience & Gas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shell Trademark Management Inc. and Motiva Enterprises LLC
Defendant: LLB Convenience & Gas, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01308
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
2 Judge: Embry J Kidd
3 Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 19 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal, #2 Complaint) (RDO)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #17. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate any pending deadlines and close the file in this case. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/1/2020. (JRR)
August 31, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal with prejudice by Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Trademark Management Inc. (McDonald, Francis) Modified on 9/1/2020 (RDO).
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #14 Order to comply with electronic filing to Notice to Additional Counsel Not Registered for Case Management and Electronic Filing filed by Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Trademark Management Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - User Info MDFL)(Long, Sarah) Modified on 8/18/2020 (RDO).
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Trademark Management Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Saudi Aramco for Motiva Enterprises LLC.. (McDonald, Francis)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Sarah Long to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/4/2020. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. (PML) ctp
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/28/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed/mailed
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-1308-ORL-40EJK. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/28/2020. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER In the interests of justice, the undersigned transfers this case to United States Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd, with his permission, to be considered along with LLB Convenience & Gas, Inc. v. Southeast Petro Distributors, Inc., No. 6:18-cv-00914-40EJK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/27/2020. (MB)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul G. Byron. New case number: 6:20-cv-1308-ORL-40GJK. Judge Gregory A. Presnell no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER reassigning this case to the Honorable Paul G. Byron for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 1.04(b). Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/27/2020. (LAM)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint part 1, #2 Complaint part 2, #3 Complaint part 3) (RDO)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to LLB Convenience & Gas, Inc.. (RDO)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases 6:18-cv-00914-Orl-40EJK per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Trademark Management Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (McDonald, Francis)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Trademark Management Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(McDonald, Francis)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-1308-Orl-31GJK. (SJB)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17093017) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Civil Cover Sheet #25 Proposed Summons to LLB Convenience & Gas, Inc.)(McDonald, Francis) Modified on 7/24/2020 (RDO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shell Trademark Management Inc. et al v. LLB Convenience & Gas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shell Trademark Management Inc.
Represented By: Francis Morton McDonald, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah A. Long
Represented By: Tiffany Marie Ward
Represented By: Sarah Anne Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motiva Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Francis Morton McDonald, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah A. Long
Represented By: Tiffany Marie Ward
Represented By: Sarah Anne Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLB Convenience & Gas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?