Anderson v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ANDERSON
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01363
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Notice of Settlement. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/10/2020. (JBS)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of settlement by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Concepcion, Patricia)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. Related case(s): y (Concepcion, Patricia)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order, #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Concepcion, Patricia)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MKH)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/3/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/3/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-1363-Orl-40LRH. (SJB)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 9TH Judicial Circuit Court, case number 2020004902 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17123095 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Concepcion, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ANDERSON
Represented By: R. Jeremy Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: Patricia Concepcion
Represented By: William Henry Edwards
Represented By: Jerry Dean Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?