Lashinger v. State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kayla Lashinger
Defendant: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv01365
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 Amended CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Garcia, Peter) Modified text on 9/17/2020 (LDJ).
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Garcia, Peter)
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Garcia, Peter)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Kayla Lashinger. (Matthews, Bryan)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kayla Lashinger. Related case(s): yes (Matthews, Bryan) Modified link on 8/12/2020 (LDJ).
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kayla Lashinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence)(Matthews, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. (PML) ctp
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/31/2020. (RMF)ctp
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/14/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/31/2020. (RMF)ctp
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/14/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/31/2020. (RMF)ctp
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company of Filing Notice of Removal with the State Court (Garcia, Peter)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Garcia, Peter)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Garcia, Peter)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Shaun Garcia on behalf of State Farm Automobile Insurance Company (Garcia, Peter)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-1365-Orl-78EJK. (SJB)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Kevin Knight on behalf of State Farm Automobile Insurance Company (Knight, Thomas)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seminole County Circuit Court, case number 2020-CA-001564-08-W filed in State Court on 6/30/20. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17123424) filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 State Court COMPLAINT, #6 State Court ANSWER, #7 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 State Court Other Documents, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Knight, Thomas) Modified on 7/31/2020 (LDJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lashinger v. State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Lashinger
Represented By: Bryan Dale Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Kevin Knight
Represented By: Peter Shaun Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?