Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Battle Tested Fitness Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Jose N Ramos, Rashad A Mays, Battle Tested Fitness Corp. d/b/a Battle Tested Fitness and Battle Tested Fitness Corp. doing business as Battle Tested Fitness
Case Number: 6:2020cv01445
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 8/26/2020 by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. as to Rashad A Mays (Giles, Brian) Modified text on 8/28/2020 (LDJ).
August 27, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 8/24/2020 by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. as to Battle Tested Fitness Corp. (Giles, Brian) Modified text on 8/28/2020 (LDJ).
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 8/13/2020 by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. as to Jose N Ramos by service on Jane Doe. (Giles, Brian) Modified on 8/25/2020 (SPM).
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (LDJ) (copies mailed)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Giles, Brian)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 Remark: Doc. #7 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/17/20. (MT)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Battle Tested Fitness Corp., Rashad A Mays, Jose N Ramos filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Giles, Brian)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Giles, Brian)
August 13, 2020 Set deadline: Amended Complaint due by 8/19/2020 (LDJ)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. On or before Wednesday, August 19, 2020, Plaintiff may file an amendedcomplaint correcting the deficiency identified in this Order. Failure totimely file will result in closure of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/13/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/27/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/13/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/27/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/13/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Battle Tested Fitness Corp., Rashad A Mays, Jose N Ramos. (LDJ)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-1445-Orl-37GJK. (SJB)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Battle Tested Fitness Corp., Rashad A Mays, Jose N Ramos (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17166967) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Giles, Brian) Modified text on 8/12/2020 (LDJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Battle Tested Fitness Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose N Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashad A Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Battle Tested Fitness Corp. d/b/a Battle Tested Fitness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Battle Tested Fitness Corp. doing business as Battle Tested Fitness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Brian T. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?