Ehmer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Laura Jean Ehmer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2020cv01491
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
2 Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 6:20-cv-1491-Orl-18PDB. Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman no longer assigned to the case. (NAS)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ARJ)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (ARJ)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/18/2020. (MKH)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Laura Jean Ehmer. Related case(s): yes (Culbertson, Richard)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 8/18/2020. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-1491-Orl-18LRH. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (SJB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Patience Jacobs on behalf of Laura Jean Ehmer (Jacobs, Sarah)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Laura Jean Ehmer. (Culbertson, Richard)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Laura Jean Ehmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Appendix Marshals Forms)(Culbertson, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ehmer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Jean Ehmer
Represented By: Richard A. Culbertson
Represented By: Sarah Patience Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?