Goodman v. CR Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Billy Goodman
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc and Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Case Number: 6:2020cv01504
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Set deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/9/2020. (KNC)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #37 Motion to Stay. The parties are DIRECTED to file a joint status report on or before Monday, November 9, 2020. The Clerk is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/11/2020. (BIA)
September 11, 2020 Filing 40 Remark: Doc. #38 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/11/20. (EBU)
September 10, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #32 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. Related case(s): y (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ocariz, Rebecca)
September 10, 2020 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #33 Interested Persons Order by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ocariz, Rebecca) Modified on 9/11/2020 (KNC).
September 8, 2020 Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Stay AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Ocariz, Rebecca)
September 8, 2020 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Inc. (Ocariz, Rebecca) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
September 3, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca S. Vinocur on behalf of Billy Goodman (Vinocur, Rebecca)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. (PML) ctp
August 27, 2020 Filing 33 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/27/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
August 27, 2020 Filing 32 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/27/2020. (BIA)
August 21, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca A. Ocariz on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Inc (Ocariz, Rebecca)
August 21, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Sabrina R. Gallo on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Inc (Gallo, Sabrina)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant McKesson Corporation (see Doc. 1-8) are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Defendant McKesson Corporation as a Defendant in this action. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/19/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/20/2020. (JLE)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/19/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE to counsel Melissa Dorman Matthews, Jordan E Jarreau, Eric Martin Przybysz, Darren McDowell, Jessica Junek and Steven Scott Schulte of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MAA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 25 TRANSFER IN from the Northern District of Texas. Case assigned to District Judge Dalton and Magistrate Judge Kidd. New Case Number: 6:20-cv-1504-ORL-37EJK. (MAA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02276. File received electronically
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Joanne Burks's case be severed and transferred to the Ashland Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (Civil case 3:20-cv-2275-S opened); b. Plaintiff Billy Goodman's case be severed and transferred to the Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2276-S opened); c. Plaintiff John Lewis's case be severed and transferred to the Ashland Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (Civil case 3:20-cv-2277-S opened); d. Plaintiff Deborah Melton's case be severed and transferred to the Florence Division of the District of South Carolina (Civil case 3:20-cv-2278-S opened); e. Plaintiff Jolanda Pulliam's case be severed and transferred to the Cape Girardeau Division of the Eastern District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2279-S opened); f. Plaintiff Maria Terry's case be severed and transferred to the District of Columbia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2280-S opened); g. Plaintiff Emmitt Thomas's case be severed and transferred to the Nashville Division of the Middle District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2281-S opened); h. Plaintiff Melissa Tuttle's case be severed and transferred to the Buffalo Division of the Western District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2282-S opened); i. Plaintiff Beverly William's s case be severed and transferred to the Miami Division of the Southern District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2283-S opened). Plaintiff Laverne Keeling is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/18/2020) (axm) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Joanne Burks, Billy Goodman, Laverne Keeling, John Lewis, Deborah Melton, Jolanda Pulliam, Maria Terry, Emmitt Thomas, Melissa Tuttle, Beverly William re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Joanne Burks, Billy Goodman, Laverne Keeling, John Lewis, Deborah Melton, Jolanda Pulliam, Maria Terry, Emmitt Thomas, Melissa Tuttle, Beverly William re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Joanne Burks, Billy Goodman, Laverne Keeling, John Lewis, Deborah Melton, Jolanda Pulliam, Maria Terry, Emmitt Thomas, Melissa Tuttle, Beverly William (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Joanne Burks, Billy Goodman, Laverne Keeling, John Lewis, Jolanda Pulliam, Maria Terry, Emmitt Thomas, Melissa Tuttle, Beverly William re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Joanne Burks, Billy Goodman, Laverne Keeling, John Lewis, Deborah Melton, Jolanda Pulliam, Maria Terry, Emmitt Thomas, Melissa Tuttle, Beverly William (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #3 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Joanne Burks, Billy Goodman, Laverne Keeling, John Lewis, Deborah Melton, Jolanda Pulliam, Maria Terry, Emmitt Thomas, Melissa Tuttle, Beverly William (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 10 replaced to flatten image on 6/16/2020) (dsr). [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer. All future pleadings shall subsequently be filed under Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-01490-S. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/10/2020) (aaa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 5 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #3 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10899538) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Docs, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info. Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued Bard Peripheral Vascular, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued C.R. Bard Inc., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Citation Issued McKisson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Executed Aff of Service to McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Executed Return of Service C.R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Executed Return of Service Bard Peripheral) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodman v. CR Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Rebecca A. Ocariz
Represented By: Sabrina R. Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Rebecca A. Ocariz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Rebecca A. Ocariz
Represented By: Sabrina R. Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Goodman
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Rebecca S. Vinocur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?