Dale v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: David George Dale
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2020cv01507
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
2 Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 6:20-cv-1507-Orl-18MRM. Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd no longer assigned to the case. (NAS)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (TNP)
September 9, 2020 FEES paid by David George Dale (Filing fee $400 receipt number ORL093216) (ARJ)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall have until and including September 4, 2020 to submit a renewed Motion addressing the deficiencies identified by this Order or otherwise pay the $400 filing fee to the Clerk of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/21/2020. (RMN)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 8/20/2020. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (ARJ)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-1507-Orl-18EJK. Motion(s) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by David George Dale. Related case(s): no (LeFevre, Ashley)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by David George Dale. (LeFevre, Ashley)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by David George Dale and USM 285 Form. (LeFevre, Ashley) Modified on 8/19/2020 (ARJ).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security with Jury Demand filed by David George Dale.(LeFevre, Ashley)(Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #1 Exhibit A-Notice od Decision, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ARJ). Modified on 8/19/2020 (ARJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dale v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David George Dale
Represented By: Paul J. Morgan
Represented By: Ashley Cherry LeFevre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?