Norville v. Southern-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: juliana norville and Juliana J. Norville
Defendant: Southern-Owners Insurance Company and Michael Nieves Campis
Case Number: 6:2020cv01618
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Arango, Eduardo)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Background Report), #2 Exhibit B (CRN))(Crowley, Melissa)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Attorney's Fees and Costs by Juliana J. Norville. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT)(Arango, Eduardo) Modified on 10/5/2020 (SPM).
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Juliana J. Norville. (Arango, Eduardo) Modified on 9/18/2020 (SPM).
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint , MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Deny Joinder and Drop Co-Defendant by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Police Report), #2 Exhibit B (Complaint), #3 Exhibit C (Return of Service), #4 Exhibit D (Correspondence))(Crowley, Melissa) Modified on 9/18/2020 (SPM).
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #6 Amended Complaint by Southern-Owners Insurance Company.(Crowley, Melissa)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Crowley, Melissa) Modified on 9/18/2020 (SPM).
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Crowley, Melissa)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020.(MDH)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Juliana J. Norville.(Arango, Eduardo)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/3/2020. (MEH) ctp
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/17/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/3/2020. (MEH) ctp
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/17/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/3/2020. (MEH) ctp
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-1618-Orl-41LRH. (SJB)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Osceola County, case number 2020-CA-1838 filed in State Court on July 24, 2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17263094 filed by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crowley, Melissa) Modified on 9/3/2020 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norville v. Southern-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa Danielle Crowley
Represented By: Harley Christine Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Nieves Campis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: juliana norville
Represented By: Eduardo Daniel Arango
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliana J. Norville
Represented By: Eduardo Daniel Arango
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?