Guan v. Ellingsworth Residential Community Association, Inc.
Appellee: Ellingsworth Residential Community Association, Inc.
Appellant: Alice Guan
Case Number: 6:2020cv01734
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION/NOTICE for the Court gently excuse J. Luna, C. Taylor, and D. Velasquez and their law firm, Latham, Luna, Eden & Beaudine, LLP from this case and to politely direct the debtor to engage new law firm by Alice Guan. (Attachments: #1 Part 1, #2 Part 2, #3 Part 3)(LAK)
October 30, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing "Notice to the Court on the Court's 8/28/2020 Ruling, on Creditor Alice Guan's Notices of Appeals Filed Due to She Could not Hear Sections of the July 23, 2020 Hearing, and on Recent Court's Transmittal of Some of the Notices of Appeal to the District Court" by Alice Guan (Attachments: #1 attachment)(KNC)
October 30, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Answers to Jurisdiction Questions in the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit by Alice Guan (Attachments: #1 attachment)(KNC)
October 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of filing "Docket Appear Edited, Respectfully Request Court Put the Two (2) Transcripts (for hearings that took place on 8/21/2020 and 9/10/2020, filed with the Court on October 28, 2020) onto the Docket" by Alice Guan (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy document)(LAK)
October 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of filing No Recipients or Certificates or Reference to USPS for Five (5) Certificate of Mailing via Bankruptcy Noticing Center by Alice Guan (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy document)(LAK)
October 29, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of filing 8/21/20 transcript with the Bankruptcy Court by Alice Guan (Attachments: #1 Part 1, #2 Part 2, #3 Part 3, #4 Part 4, #5 Part 5, #6 Part 6, #7 Part 7, #8 Part 8)(LAK)
October 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of filing 9/10/20 transcript with the Bankruptcy Court by Alice Guan (Attachments: #1 pages 1 to 15, #2 pages 16 to 30)(LAK)
October 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of filing 9/10/20 transcript with the Bankruptcy Court by Alice Guan (LAK) Attachment #1 17 pages of transcript. Modified on 10/29/2020 (LAK).
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of filing 8/21/20 transcript with the Bankruptcy Court by Alice Guan (LAK)
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing 9/10/20 transcript with the Bankruptcy Court by Alice Guan (LAK)
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Alice Guan. (LAK)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Alice Guan. Related case(s): yes (LAK)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing compliance. It is ORDERED that Appellant shall file a response to Orders #2 and #3 on or before November 9, 2020. Failure to comply may result in the dismissal of the case or the imposition of sanctions without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/26/2020. (RMF)ctp
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal filed by Alice Guan. (Attachments: #1 2 notice of appeal, #2 3 designation, #3 4 docket sheet, #4 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_11_SubchapterV, #5 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000015_Notice_of_Filing_Balance_Sheet_and_2019_Tax_Return_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_on_behalf_of_Deb, #6 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000021_Schedules_AB_D_EF_G_H_Statement_of_Assets_and_Liabilities_Statement_of_Financial_Affai, #7 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000024_Status_Report, #8 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000042_Financial_Reports_for_the_Period_April_1_2020_to_April_30_2020_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_o, #9 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000043_Amended_Financial_Reports_for_the_Period_03032020_to_03312020_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna, #10 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000048_Financial_Reports_for_the_Period_April_1_2020_to_April_30_2020_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_o, #11 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000048_Financial_Reports_for_the_Period_April_1_2020_to_April_30_2020_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_o_2, #12 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000051_Objection_to_Debtors_Subchapter_V_Election_Filed_by_Bradley_M_Saxton_on_behalf_of_Credito, #13 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000054_Chapter_11_Plan_of_Reorganization__Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Ellingswort, #14 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000055_Part_1_Omnibus_Objection_to_Claim, #15 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000055_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #16 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000055_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #17 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000055_Part_4_Exhibit_C, #18 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000061_Response_to, #19 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000064_Combined_Amended_Motion, #20 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000065_Notice_of_Filing_Transcript_of_Section_341_Meeting_of_Creditors_Filed_by_Bradley_M_Saxton, #21 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000066_Notice_of_Filing_341_Creditors_Meeting_Transcript_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #22 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000067_Motion_for_Authority_to_Maintain_Pre-Petition_Bank_Accounts_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_on_beha, #23 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000079_Order_Scheduling_Hearing_on_Confirmation_of_Plan_and_Establishing_Deadlines, #24 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000085_Second_Amended_Motion_and_Amended_Response_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #25 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000087_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibit_Q_for_Amended_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #26 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000088_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibit_R_for_Amended_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #27 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000089_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibit_W_for_Amended_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #28 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000090_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibit_V_for_Amended_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #29 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000091_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibit_U_for_Amended_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #30 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000092_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibit_T_for_Amended_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #31 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000093_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibit_S_for_Amended_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #32 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000094_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibit_EE_for_Amended_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #33 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000101_Exhibit_GGG_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #34 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000102_Exhibit_FFF_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #35 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000103_Exhibit_EEE_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #36 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000104_Exhibit_DDD_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #37 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000105_Exhibit_CCC_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #38 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000106_Exhibit_AAA_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #39 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000107_Exhibit_BBB_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #40 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000108_Objection_to_Debtors_Omnibus_Objection_to_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #41 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000110_Notice_of_Filing_Response_in_Opposition_to_Debtors_Ominibus_Obj_to_Allowance_of_Claim_4-, #42 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000121_Notice_of_Filing_of_June_17_Hearing_Transcript_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #43 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000126_Corrective_Notice_of_Filing_Appeal_Cover_sheet_and_Appeal_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #44 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000127_Notice_of_Appeal_Re_Order_Scheduling_Hearing_on_Confirmation_of_Plan_and_Establishing_De, #45 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000134_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_and_Motion_for_Certification_of_Direct_Appeal_to_Eleventh_C, #46 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000135_Notice_of_Filing_Motion_for_Accepting_at_Least_One_of_the_Three_Checks_Each_Paying_for_the, #47 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000136_Motion_for_Accepting_at_Least_One_of_Three_Checks_each_Paying_for_the_Filing_Fee_of_2980, #48 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000137_Certificate_of_Mailing_via_Bankruptcy_Noticing_Center_re_Notice_of_Appeal, #49 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000142_Order_Overruling_Alice_Guans_Objection_to_Debtors_Eligibility_under_Subchapter_V, #50 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000144_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_and_Motion_for_Certificati, #51 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000145_Transmittal_of_Notice_of_Appeal_to_District_Court_Case_No_620-cv-1243-Orl-WWB, #52 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000147_Objection_to_Debtors_Plan_and_Motion_for_Case_Not_Dismissed_and_for_Relief_form_Automatic, #53 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000149_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Plan_and_Written_Rejection_of_Debtors_Plan_Filed_by_Creditor, #54 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000151_Emergency_Amended_Motion_Supplemental_to_Motion_for_Relief_from_the_Automatic_Stay_as_to, #55 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000154_Supplement_to_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_and_Motion_for_Certification_of_Direct_Appeal, #56 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000156_Supplement_to_Notice_of_Appeal_Stealth_Order_Denying_Motions_Objecting_Debtors_Subchapter, #57 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000159_Notice_of_preliminary_hearing_on_Supplement_to_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_and_Motion_f, #58 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000161_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #59 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000161_Part_2_notice_of_hearing, #60 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000161_Part_3_motion_to_correct_error_in_145_Transmittal_of_ntc_of_appeal_to_DC, #61 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000162_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_Designation_of_Items_Statement_of_Issues_and_Written_Request_for_Transc, #62 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000162_Part_2_Designation_of_Items_Statement_of_Issues_and_Written_Request_for_Transcript, #63 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000163_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_Ntc_of_Hearing_and_Motion_to_correct_title_of_court_entry_127_Filed_by_C, #64 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000163_Part_2_Ntc_of_Preliminary_Hearing, #65 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000163_Part_3_Motion_to_correct_title_of_court_entry_127, #66 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000164_Motion_to_Correct_Error_in_Courts_Doc_145_titled_Transmittal_of_Notice_of_Appeal_to_Dist, #67 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000165_Appellant_Designation_of_Contents_for_Inclusion_in_Record_on_Appeal__Statement_of_Issues, #68 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000166_Motion_to_Correct_Error_in_the_Title_of_Courts_Docket_Entry_for_Doc_No_127_Filed_by_Cred, #69 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000170_Memorandum_in_Opposition_to_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_and_Motion_for_Certification_of, #70 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000172_Opposition_to_Debtors_Memorandum_in_Opposition_to_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_and_Moti, #71 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000176_Notice_to_the_Court_on_Alice_Guans_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_filed_on_June_15_2020_he, #72 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000177_Notice_of_Filing_United_States_Bankruptcy_Court_Eastern_District_of_New_York_Judges_Suppl, #73 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000184_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_and_Motion_for_Certification_of_Direct_Appeal, #74 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000189_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_and_Motion_for, #75 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000190_First_Supplemental_Appellant_Designation_of_Contents_for_Inclusion_in_Record_on_Appeal__S, #76 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000191_Agreed_Order_Granting_Motion_For_Authority_to_Maintain_Pre-Petition_Bank_Accounts, #77 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000194_Notice_of_Filing_Transcript_of_Proceedings_Held_on_July_23_2020_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_G, #78 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000195_Notice_to_the_Court_on_Not_Able_to_Hear_During_Hearing_and_Notice_of_Filing_Such_Notice_to, #79 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000203_Motion_for_Rehearing_on_Agreed_Order_Granting_Motion_For_Authority_to_Maintain_Pre-Petitio, #80 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000205_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_a, #81 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000206_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Rehearing_on_Agreed_Order_Granting_Motion_For_Authority_to_Mainta, #82 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000209_Order_Granting_in_Part_Motions_to_Correct_Error, #83 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000210_Order_Denying_Combined_Amended_Motion_and_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_by_Alice_Guan, #84 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000213_Motion_for_Leave_to_File_Second_Supplemental_Designation_of_Items_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice, #85 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000214_Second_Supplemental_Appellant_Designation_of_Contents_for_Inclusion_in_Record_on_Appeal_Fi, #86 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000241_Motion_for_Leave_to_File_Ameded_or_2nd_Supplemental_Notice_of_Appeal_Disguised_Order, #87 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000242_Amended_or_Second_Supplemental_Notice_of_Appeal_Disguised_Order, #88 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000243_Notice_of_Filing_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #89 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000244_Amended_or_Supplemental_Appeal_Cover_Sheet_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #90 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000245_Request_by_Pro_Se_Creditor_Alice_Guan_to_receive_all_notices_sent_by_the_Court_by_electron, #91 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000247_Motion_for_Leave_to_File_Amended_or_3rd_Supplemental_Designation_of_Items_Statement_of_Is, #92 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000248_Amended_or_Third_Supplemental_Designation_of_Items_Statement_of_Issues_and_Written_Reque, #93 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000250_Notice_of_Filing_Modification_to_Plan_of_Reorganization_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_on_behalf_o, #94 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000311_Amended_or_Second_Supplemental_Notice_of_Appeal_Disguised_Order_Verbal_Order_from_June_17, #95 6-20-bk-1346_Docket_000252_Response_to_Debtors_Response_In_Opposition_to_Alice_Guans_Motion_for_Relief_from_the_Aut, #96 6-20-bk-1346_Docket_000253_Objection_to_Notice_of_Filing_Modification_to_Plan_of_Reorganization_and_Alice_G
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Ellingsworth Residential Community Association, Inc.. (Taylor, Christina)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related Case Order and Notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ellingsworth Residential Community Association, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Taylor, Christina) Modified on 10/19/2020 (KNC).
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/2/2020. (RMF)ctp
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/16/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/2/2020. (RMF)ctp
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/16/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/2/2020. (RMF)ctp
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of interlocutory appeal by Alice Guan. Bankruptcy Court case number 6:20-bk-01346-KSJ. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Sheet)(KNC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guan v. Ellingsworth Residential Community Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ellingsworth Residential Community Association, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Luna
Represented By: Christina Y. Taylor
Represented By: Daniel A. Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Alice Guan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?