Florida Virtual School v. D2L Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Florida Virtual School
Defendant: D2L Limited and D2L Corporation
Case Number: 6:2020cv01788
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER discharging the Court's October 1, 2020 Order to Show Cause #5 in light of Plaintiff's response #11. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/16/20. (EBU)
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (KNC)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 Order to show cause filed by Florida Virtual School. (Keown, Lindy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Florida Virtual School. (Keown, Lindy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Florida Virtual School. Related case(s): No (Keown, Lindy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Florida Virtual School. (Thielhelm, Robert)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Florida Virtual School. (Thielhelm, Robert)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (RN)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: On or before Thursday, October 15, 2020, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by written response why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/1/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/15/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/1/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/15/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/1/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:20-cv-1788-Orl-37DCI. (SJB)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D2L Corporation, D2L Limited (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17372310) filed by Florida Virtual School. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Thielhelm, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Virtual School v. D2L Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D2L Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D2L Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Virtual School
Represented By: Robert W. Thielhelm, Jr.
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?