Hall v. Insurance Corporation of British Columbia
Plaintiff: Richard Hall
Defendant: Insurance Corporation of British Columbia
Case Number: 6:2020cv01992
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting in part and denying without prejudice in part #14 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Amended Motion to Dismiss to Conduct Limited Jurisdictional Discovery ; denying as moot #27 Stipulation to Extend Time for Parties to Submit Joint Case Management Report. Plaintiff shall have up to and including January 11, 2021 to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss. The parties shall file their Case Management Report on or before December 29, 2020. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/22/2020. (MKH)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Set deadlines as to #7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ( Responses due by 1/11/2021), Set deadlines: ( Case management report due by 12/29/2020) (SPM)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Parties to Submit Joint Case Management Report by Richard Hall. (Mark, Etan) Modified on 12/14/2020 (SPM).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Richard Hall. (Mark, Etan)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying as moot #22 Motion for Leave to File Reply; granting #23 Amended Motion for Leave to File Reply; granting in part #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file a reply brief, not to exceed seven (7) pages, on or before December 8, 2020. The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's amended motion to dismiss (Doc. 7) is hereby STAYED pending the Court's resolution of the Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Amended Motion to Dismiss to Conduct Limited Jurisdictional Discovery (Doc. 14).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/1/2020. (MKH)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Richard Hall. (Mark, Etan) Modified on 12/1/2020 (SPM).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Conduct Limited Jurisdictional Discovery by Richard Hall. (Mark, Etan)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Conduct Limited Jurisdictional Discovery by Richard Hall. (Mark, Etan)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Insurance Corporation of British Columbia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scheer, Mark)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Insurance Corporation of British Columbia. (Scheer, Mark) Modified on 11/17/2020 (SPM).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #10 Related case order by Insurance Corporation of British Columbia. Related case(s): no (Scheer, Mark) Modified on 11/17/2020 (SPM).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss in light of #7 Amended Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/16/2020. (KMS)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE to counsel Niki Namazi of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copy mailed) (TNP)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Richard Hall. Related case(s): no (Mark, Etan)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Richard Hall. (Mark, Etan)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Richard Hall. (Mark, Etan) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (TNP).
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020.(MDH)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/4/2020. (MEH) ctp
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/18/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/4/2020. (MEH) ctp
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/18/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/4/2020. (MEH) ctp
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mark P. Scheer, Esq., may specially appear in this case as counsel for Defendant with Gary F. Baumann, Esq., serving as local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/29/2020. (MKH)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Renewed MOTION for Mark P. Scheer to appear pro hac vice by Insurance Corporation of British Columbia. (Baumann, Gary) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified text on 10/29/2020 (TNP).
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Insurance Corporation of British Columbia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Baumann, Gary)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/28/2020. (MKH)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Mark P. Scheer to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17480947 for $150 by Insurance Corporation of British Columbia. (Baumann, Gary) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Insurance Corporation of British Columbia. (Baumann, Gary) (No signature. Contacted counsel to re-file.) Modified on 10/28/2020 (SPM).
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Daniel S. Maland of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copy mailed) (SPM)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-1992-Orl-41LRH. (SJB)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida, case number 2020-CA-006312-O filed in State Court on 06/11/20. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17476020 filed by Insurance Corporation of British Columbia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Other Documents)(Baumann, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Insurance Corporation of British Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Corporation of British Columbia
Represented By: Gary Francis Baumann
Represented By: Mark P. Scheer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hall
Represented By: Etan Mark
Represented By: Niki Namazi
Represented By: Daniel Scott Maland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?