Vernitus v. Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Vanes Vernitus
Defendant: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli, Acting Secretary Chad Wolf, Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 6:2020cv01998
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #14 Related case/interested persons/ECF-1 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. Related case(s): yes (Smart, Adam)
January 19, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Vanes Vernitus. (Stoller, David)
January 5, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Related case/interested persons/ECF-1 by Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (Smart, Adam)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RELATED CASE ORDER, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing for DEFENDANTS. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/19/2021. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/19/2021. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/4/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
January 4, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smart, Adam) Modified on 1/5/2021 (RDO).
December 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Compliance by Vanes Vernitus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stoller, David) Modified on 12/3/2020 (RDO).
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed on 11/6/20 as to the Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security by Vanes Vernitus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stoller, David) Modified on 12/3/2020 (RDO).
December 2, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed ON 11/10/20 as to the Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services by Vanes Vernitus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stoller, David) Modified on 12/3/2020 (RDO).
December 2, 2020 Filing 9 (DOCUMENT NOT PROPERLY FILLED OUT) SUMMONS returned executed by Vanes Vernitus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stoller, David) Modified on 12/3/2020 (RDO).
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 (FILED IN WRONG CASE) SUMMONS returned executed by Vanes Vernitus. Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security served on 11/6/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stoller, David) Modified on 12/3/2020 (RDO).
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 (FILED IN WRONG CASE) SUMMONS returned executed by Vanes Vernitus. Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stoller, David) Modified on 12/3/2020 (RDO).
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (RDO)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case/interested persons/ECF-1 by Vanes Vernitus. (Stoller, David)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #3 Related Case Order by Vanes Vernitus. Related case(s): yes (Stoller, David) Modified on 10/30/2020 (RDO).
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 1, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/12/2020. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 10/28/2020. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-1998-Orl-22EJK. (SJB)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17480463) filed by Vanes Vernitus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Signed Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit Denial of Form I-485)(Stoller, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vernitus v. Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanes Vernitus
Represented By: David Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?