Strickland v. CSR Pines, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Strickland
Defendant: CSR Pines, Ltd. and Pet Supermarket, Inc. doing business as Pet Supermarket #178
Case Number: 6:2020cv02025
Filed: October 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Pet Supermarket, Inc. answer or response due 1/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/29/2020. (ECJ)
December 28, 2020 Filing 24 Second Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/27/21 to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Pet Supermarket, Inc. (Davis, Kelly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified text on 12/29/2020 (LDJ).
December 4, 2020 Filing 23 Remark: Doc. #18 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/4/2020. (EJV)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant CSR Pines, Ltd. to respond to Plaintiff's complaint (Doc. No. 1) is extended up to and including January 4, 2021. The deadline for Defendant CSR Pines, Ltd. to permit Plaintiff's counsel and expert reasonable access to inspect Defendant's facility (Doc. No. 6, at 2 4) is extended up to and including January 18, 2021. No other deadlines are extended by this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/4/2020. (MKH)
December 4, 2020 Reset deadline: for CSR Pines, Ltd. Answer due by 1/4/2021. (LDJ)
December 3, 2020 Filing 21 Remark: Doc. #16 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/3/2020.(EJV)
December 3, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by CSR Pines, Ltd.. (Casey, R.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
December 3, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by CSR Pines, Ltd.. Related case(s): n (Casey, R.)
December 3, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by CSR Pines, Ltd.. (Casey, R.)
December 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Brooks Casey on behalf of CSR Pines, Ltd. (Casey, R.)
December 2, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Pet Supermarket, Inc. (Davis, Kelly) Modified link on 12/2/2020 (LDJ).
December 1, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 11/13/2020 by Michelle Strickland as to CSR Pines, Ltd.. (Quick, Joe)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #1 Complaint. Pet Supermarket, Inc. answer or response due 12/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 11/30/2020. (MKH)
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/28/20 to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Pet Supermarket, Inc. (Davis, Kelly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified text on 11/25/2020 (LDJ).
November 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Lyon Davis on behalf of Pet Supermarket, Inc. (Davis, Kelly)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #6 Order pdf by Michelle Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Cases List)(Quick, Joe)
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 Remark: Doc. #8 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/12/20. (EBU)
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 11/6/2020 by Michelle Strickland as to Pet Supermarket, Inc.. (Quick, Joe)
November 10, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Michelle Strickland. (Quick, Joe)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michelle Strickland. Related case(s): no (Quick, Joe)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ADA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/2/2020. (BIA)(CTP)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/16/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/2/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/16/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/2/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to CSR Pines, Ltd., Pet Supermarket, Inc. (LDJ)
October 31, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-2025-Orl-37LRH. (SJB)
October 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17496984) filed by Michelle Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons CSR Pines LTD, #3 Proposed Summons Pet Supermarket Inc.)(Quick, Joe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strickland v. CSR Pines, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR Pines, Ltd.
Represented By: R. Brooks Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pet Supermarket, Inc. doing business as Pet Supermarket #178
Represented By: Kelly Lyon Davis
Represented By: Alexis Marie Barkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Strickland
Represented By: Joe M. Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?