Abrorov v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Aziz Gulyamovich Abrorov
Defendant: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli, Acting Secretary Chad Wolf, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security and Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 6:2020cv02051
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #14 Stipulation of Dismissal. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate any pending deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/13/2021. (JBS)
May 13, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Aziz Gulyamovich Abrorov. (Stoller, David)
April 15, 2021 Filing 13 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re #12 Order filed by Aziz Gulyamovich Abrorov. (Stoller, David)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/17/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security.(Ragler, Phillip)
January 13, 2021 Reset deadlines: for Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. Answer due by 3/9/2021. (MEJ)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ANEXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Defendant shall file a response on or before March 9, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 1/12/2021. (HMK)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (Ragler, Phillip)
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of compliance by Aziz Gulyamovich Abrorov as to Attorney General on 11/16/2020 and U.S. Attorney on 11/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stoller, David) Modified on 12/3/2020 (SPM).
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF of service by Aziz Gulyamovich Abrorov as to Secretary, Department of Homeland Security served on 11/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stoller, David) Modified on 12/3/2020 (SPM).
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF of service by Aziz Gulyamovich Abrorov as to Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stoller, David) Modified on 12/3/2020 (SPM).
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (MEJ)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related Cases Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Aziz Gulyamovich Abrorov. Related case(s): yes (Stoller, David) Modified text on 11/6/2020 (MEJ).
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/5/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-2051-Orl-40GJK. (SJB)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17514634) filed by Aziz Gulyamovich Abrorov. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons P, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit Denial N-336, #5 Exhibit Denial N-400, #6 Exhibit Notice of Continuance Response)(Stoller, David) Modified text on 11/6/2020 (MEJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrorov v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aziz Gulyamovich Abrorov
Represented By: David Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?