Engdahl v. Veteran's Administration et al
Plaintiff: Jill Marie Engdahl
Defendant: United States Government, Veteran's Affairs and Veteran's Administration
Case Number: 6:2020cv02145
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Renewed Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall mail summons and Marshal 285 forms to Plaintiff. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall complete and return the summons and Marshal 285 forms to the Court within fifteen (15) days of the date of mailing. Once the completed summons and Marshal 285 forms are returned to the Court, the Clerk is directed to provide the completed service forms to the United States Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/22/2021. (MKH)
January 21, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jill Marie Engdahl. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MEJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
January 14, 2021 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Renewed Motion to Proceed Informa Pauperis or Fee payment due by 1/27/2021 (MEJ)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. On or before January 27, 2021, Plaintiff may file a renewed motion to proceed in forma pauperis by filing a completed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs (Long Form). Alternatively, on or before January 27, 2021, Plaintiff must pay the required filing fee. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of the Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs (Long Form) to Plaintiff, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/13/2021. (MKH)
December 9, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Jill Marie Engdahl. (MEJ)
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jill Marie Engdahl. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MEJ)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MKH)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/1/2020. (GNB) copies mailed
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/1/2020. (GNB) copies mailed
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/1/2020. (GNB) copies mailed
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jill Marie Engdahl. (MEJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Government, Veteran's Administration, Veteran's Affairs with Jury Demand filed by Jill Marie Engdahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope)(MEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engdahl v. Veteran's Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Marie Engdahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veteran's Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veteran's Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?