United States of America v. Approximately $5,698,846.38 Seized from Bank of America et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $1,850,165.00 Seized from Bank of America, Approximately $5,698,846.38 Seized from Bank of America and Approximately $868,250.00 Seized from First American Trust FSB
Case Number: 6:2020cv02269
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1341
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Newspaper: an official government internet site, (www.forfeiture.gov) Date(s) of publication for at least 30 consecutive days, beginning on December 17, 2020 and ending on January 15, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Andrejko, Nicole)
January 6, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF of service by United States of America (Andrejko, Nicole)
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by United States of America. (Andrejko, Nicole)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (RN)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/16/2020. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/16/2020. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant In Rem. The Clerk is directed to issue each of the three "Warrant of Arrest In Rem" (Docs. 3-1, 3-2, and 3-3). See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/16/2020. (RN)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrants In Rem by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(TNP)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): yes (TNP)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against Approximately $1,850,165.00 Seized from Bank of America, Approximately $5,698,846.38 Seized from Bank of America, Approximately $868,250.00 Seized from First American Trust FSB filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(TNP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $5,698,846.38 Seized from Bank of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $1,850,165.00 Seized from Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $5,698,846.38 Seized from Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $868,250.00 Seized from First American Trust FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole M. Andrejko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?