Driggers v. AT&T Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Chad Driggers
Defendant: AT&T Corp. and Receivables Performance Management, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv02403
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by AT&T Corp., Receivables Performance Management, LLC.(McHale, Charles)
February 8, 2021 Reset deadline: for AT&T Corp., Receivables Performance Management, LLC. Answer due by 2/22/2021. (TNP)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Response [sic] to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file a response on or before February 22, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 2/8/2021. (HMK)
February 8, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Receivables Performance Management, LLC. (McHale, Charles) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified text on 2/8/2021 (TNP).
January 21, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on January 11, 2021 by Chad Driggers as to Receivables Performance Management, LLC. (Derry, Jason)
January 21, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on January 11, 2021 by Chad Driggers as to AT&T Corp.. (Derry, Jason)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Chad Driggers. (Derry, Jason)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Chad Driggers. Related case(s): no (Derry, Jason)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Order on Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 1/6/2021. (HMK)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/5/2021. (MEH) ctp
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/19/2021. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/5/2021. (MEH) ctp
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/19/2021. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/5/2021. (MEH) ctp
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to AT&T Corp. and Receivables Performance Management, LLC. (ARJ)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-2403-ORL-41GJK. (LRB)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Corp., Receivables Performance Management, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17715496) filed by Chad Driggers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to be Issued as to Defendants, AT&T Corp and Receivables Performance Management, LLC)(Derry, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Driggers v. AT&T Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Dale Thomas Golden
Represented By: Charles James McHale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Receivables Performance Management, LLC
Represented By: Dale Thomas Golden
Represented By: Charles James McHale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Driggers
Represented By: Jason Robert Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?