Scherer v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Ronald E. Scherer
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Zeiger, Tigges & Little, LLP, Steven Tigges and Stuart Parcell
Case Number: 6:2021cv00119
Filed: January 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scrivener's Error by Ronald E. Scherer re #1 Complaint (Rigby, Barry) Modified text on 2/10/2021 (ARJ).
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ronald E. Scherer. Related case(s): Yes (Rigby, Barry)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Ronald E. Scherer. (Rigby, Barry)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. (PML) ctp
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/20/2021. (MEH) ctp
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/3/2021. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/20/2021. (MEH) ctp
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/3/2021. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/20/2021. (MEH) ctp
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (ARJ)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:21-cv-0119-Orl-41EJK. (SJB)
January 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17777559) filed by Ronald E. Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons All Defendants, #3 Exhibit Index, #4 Exhibit Part 1 - Ex. 1 - 17, #5 Exhibit Part 2 - Ex. 18 - 29)(Rigby, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scherer v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeiger, Tigges & Little, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Tigges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Parcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald E. Scherer
Represented By: Barry William Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?