BAS Technologies, LLC et al v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, et al
Plaintiff: BAS Technologies, LLC and Simon Smith
Defendant: David Pekoske, Monty Wilkinson, Donna P. Campagnolo, Acting Director Tracy Renaud, Director, California Service Center, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney General and Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 6:2021cv00237
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice re #15 Notice of voluntary dismissal. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/16/2021. (LAM)
March 15, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by BAS Technologies, LLC, Simon Smith (Burgos, Alice)
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF of service by BAS Technologies, LLC, Simon Smith (Burgos, Alice)
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action re #4 Order per Local Rule 1.07(c) by BAS Technologies, LLC, Simon Smith. Related case(s): No (Burgos, Alice) Modified on 3/4/2021 (MEJ).
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #9 Special Admission Attorney Certificate [Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]. Counsel is advised that he must comply with the requirements of Local Rule 2.01(c), most of which are not addressed in the form utilized by counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 3/3/2021. (HMK)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER. Upon consideration of the #8 Response to order to show cause filed by Simon Smith, BAS Technologies, LLC, the show cause order #5 is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/3/2021. (LAM)
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by BAS Technologies, LLC, Simon Smith. U.S. Attorney General served on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Burgos, Alice)
March 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Brian Scott Green to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17950359 for $150 by BAS Technologies, LLC, Simon Smith. (Burgos, Alice) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 Order to show cause filed by BAS Technologies, LLC, Simon Smith. (Burgos, Alice)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by BAS Technologies, LLC, Simon Smith re #5 Order to show cause (Burgos, Alice)
March 2, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order to show cause by BAS Technologies, LLC, Simon Smith identifying Corporate Parent BAS Technologies Ply Ltd for BAS Technologies, LLC.. (Burgos, Alice)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Plaintiffs to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed, which may include dismissal of this case, for failure to timely file the required forms in response to the Court's order. Show Cause Response due by 3/16/2021. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/2/2021. (LAM)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/10/2021. (DS) ctp
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (MEJ)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-0237-GAP-GJK. (SJB)
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Relief Pursuant to the Administrative Procedure Act and the Declaratory Judgment Act against Donna P. Campagnolo, David Pekoske, Tracy Renaud, Monty Wilkinson (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17846310) filed by BAS Technologies, LLC, Simon Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Table, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Proposed Summons Civil Process Clerk, #9 Proposed Summons David Pekoske, #10 Proposed Summons Monty Wilkinson, #11 Proposed Summons Tracy Renaud, #12 Proposed Summons Donna P. Campagnolo)(Burgos, Alice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAS Technologies, LLC et al v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAS Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Alice Carmen Burgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Smith
Represented By: Alice Carmen Burgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Pekoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monty Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna P. Campagnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Tracy Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, California Service Center, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?