Braga Da Silva Filho et al v. Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Pedro Vinhaes Braga Da Silva, Luiza Almeida Cruz, Dasio Braga Da Silva Filho, Julia Almeida Cruz, Patricia Almeida Braga Da Silva and Laura Almeida Braga Da Silva
Defendant: Division Chief Lori Mackenzie, Director Tracy Renaud, Chief Sarah Kendall, Secretary David Pekoske, Attorney General Monty Wilkinson, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chief Immigrant Investor Program, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 6:2021cv00283
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Laura Almeida Braga Da Silva, Luiza Almeida Cruz, Patricia Almeida Braga Da Silva, Dasio Braga Da Silva Filho, Pedro Vinhaes Braga Da Silva, Julia Almeida Cruz. All Defendants. (Hurd, Rusten)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Laura Almeida Braga Da Silva, Luiza Almeida Cruz, Patricia Almeida Braga Da Silva, Dasio Braga Da Silva Filho, Pedro Vinhaes Braga Da Silva, Julia Almeida Cruz. Attorney General of the United States served on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Hurd, Rusten)
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Laura Almeida Braga Da Silva, Luiza Almeida Cruz, Patricia Almeida Braga Da Silva, Dasio Braga Da Silva Filho, Pedro Vinhaes Braga Da Silva, Julia Almeida Cruz. Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 2/19/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. (Hurd, Rusten)
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Laura Almeida Braga Da Silva, Luiza Almeida Cruz, Patricia Almeida Braga Da Silva, Dasio Braga Da Silva Filho, Pedro Vinhaes Braga Da Silva, Julia Almeida Cruz. Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 2/19/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. (Hurd, Rusten)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Laura Almeida Braga Da Silva, Luiza Almeida Cruz, Patricia Almeida Braga Da Silva, Dasio Braga Da Silva Filho, Pedro Vinhaes Braga Da Silva, Julia Almeida Cruz. Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 2/19/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. (Hurd, Rusten)
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Laura Almeida Braga Da Silva, Luiza Almeida Cruz, Patricia Almeida Braga Da Silva, Dasio Braga Da Silva Filho, Pedro Vinhaes Braga Da Silva, Julia Almeida Cruz. Chief Immigrant Investor Program, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 2/19/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. (Hurd, Rusten)
February 15, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Laura Almeida Braga Da Silva, Patricia Almeida Braga Da Silva, Julia Almeida Cruz, Luiza Almeida Cruz, Dasio Braga Da Silva Filho, Pedro Vinhaes Braga Da Silva. (Hurd, Rusten)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/11/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Attorney General of the United States, Chief Immigrant Investor Program, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney. (MEJ)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:21-cv-0283-ACC-DCI. (SJB)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Mandamus Relief against Sarah Kendall, Lori Mackenzie, David Pekoske, Tracy Renaud, Monty Wilkinson (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17870945) filed by Laura Almeida Braga Da Silva, Luiza Almeida Cruz, Patricia Almeida Braga Da Silva, Dasio Braga Da Silva Filho, Pedro Vinhaes Braga Da Silva, Julia Almeida Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summon (Kendall), #3 Proposed Summons Summon (Mackenzie), #4 Proposed Summons Summon (Renaud), #5 Proposed Summons Summon (Pekoske), #6 Proposed Summons Summon (Wilkinson), #7 Proposed Summons Summon (Chapa Lopez))(Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 2/11/2021 (MEJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braga Da Silva Filho et al v. Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Vinhaes Braga Da Silva
Represented By: Rusten C. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luiza Almeida Cruz
Represented By: Rusten C. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dasio Braga Da Silva Filho
Represented By: Rusten C. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Almeida Cruz
Represented By: Rusten C. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Almeida Braga Da Silva
Represented By: Rusten C. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Almeida Braga Da Silva
Represented By: Rusten C. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division Chief Lori Mackenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Tracy Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Sarah Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary David Pekoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Monty Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Immigrant Investor Program, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?