Bolin v. Coquina Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Bolin
Defendant: Marilyn G. Wood, MCR Health, Inc., Gabriel Living Centers, LLC, Coquina Center, LLC, MCR Health, Inc. doing business as Huntingdon Behavioral Health, Coquina Center, LLC doing business as Opis Coquina Center and United States of America
Case Number: 6:2021cv00357
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Anne C Conway
2 Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Dawn Bolin. (DS)
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coquina Center, LLC, Gabriel Living Centers, LLC, Marilyn G. Wood. (Eichhorn, Charles) Modified text on 4/3/2021 (LDJ).
March 12, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lake of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Dawn Bolin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LDJ)
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 9 Order no pdf by United States of America. (Ragler, Phillip)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)ctp
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/3/2021. (RMF)ctp
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lake of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ragler, Phillip)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America - Notice of Substitution of United States of America for Defendant, MCR Health, Inc. d/b/a Huntington Behavioral Health (Ragler, Phillip)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/1/2021. (RN)
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Wendy W. Berger. New case number: 6:21-cv-00357-WWB-DCI. Judge Anne C. Conway no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by MCR Health, Inc. - Notice of Amended Civil Cover Sheet (Ragler, Phillip)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:21-cv-0357-ACC-DCI. (SJB)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by MCR Health, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Ragler, Phillip)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Volusia County Circuit Court, case number 2020 31180 CICI filed in State Court on 8/31/2020. filed by MCR Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Certificate of USA), #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents Exhibit C - Part 1, #5 State Court Other Documents Exhibit C - Part 2, #6 State Court Other Documents Exhibit C - Part 3, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ragler, Phillip) Modified text on 2/25/2021 (LDJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolin v. Coquina Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn G. Wood
Represented By: Danielle Jasmin Brown
Represented By: Charles Gerard Eichhorn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCR Health, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Living Centers, LLC
Represented By: Danielle Jasmin Brown
Represented By: Charles Gerard Eichhorn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coquina Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCR Health, Inc. doing business as Huntingdon Behavioral Health
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coquina Center, LLC doing business as Opis Coquina Center
Represented By: Danielle Jasmin Brown
Represented By: Charles Gerard Eichhorn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?