Malcolm v. Florida Career College et al
Plaintiff: Princess Malcolm
Defendant: Brookshire International Academy, International Education Corporation, Florida Career College and IEC U.S. Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00453
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration re #1 Complaint, by Florida Career College, IEC U.S. Holdings, Inc., International Education Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Jennifer) Modified on 4/20/2021 (SPM).
March 23, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Princess Malcolm Final JS-44 (Bailey, Jared)
March 23, 2021 Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #13 Attorney Gabrielle M. Vinci's Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Vinci failed to: certify that she has not "abused the privilege of special admission by maintaining a regular practice of law in Florida," which is more than 3 appearances in the state of Florida within a 365-day period, list each case in state or federal court in Florida she has appeared in the last 36 months, and certify she satisfies all requirements to obtain and maintain general admission to the Florida Bar except obtaining membership. See Local Rule 2.01(c). The Motion also fails to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/23/2021. (JLS)
March 23, 2021 Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #12 Attorney Andrew T. Milternberg's Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Milternberg failed to: certify that he has not "abused the privilege of special admission by maintaining a regular practice of law in Florida," which is more than 3 appearances in the state of Florida within a 365-day period, list each case in state or federal court in Florida he has appeared in the last 36 months, and certify he satisfies all requirements to obtain and maintain general admission to the Florida Bar except obtaining membership. See Local Rule 2.01(c). The Motion also fails to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/23/2021. (JLS)
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION for Gabrielle M. Vinci to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-18029331 for $150 Pro Hac Vice Fee by Princess Malcolm. (Bailey, Jared) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
March 22, 2021 Filing 12 First MOTION for Andrew T. Miltenberg to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-18029298 for $150 Pro Hac Vice Fee by Princess Malcolm. (Bailey, Jared) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
March 22, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of counsel Gabrielle Vinci by Jared T. Bailey on behalf of Princess Malcolm (Bailey, Jared)
March 22, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of counsel Andrew Miltenberg by Jared T. Bailey on behalf of Princess Malcolm (Bailey, Jared)
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Princess Malcolm Updated JS-44 (Bailey, Jared) (BLANK DOCUMENT. REFILED AT DOC #16.) Modified text on 3/23/2021 (LDJ).
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)ctp
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/16/2021. (RMF)ctp
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/12/2021. (JLS)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (LDJ)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Jared Bailey that Form JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet is required for the Clerk of Court to initiate a civil docket sheet. File the Civil Cover Sheet in this action using the Notice (Other) event. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Andrew Miltenberg and Gabrielle Vinci Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ) (copies mailed)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:21-cv-0453-WWB-EJK. (SJB)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402.00 Receipt # 113A-17988857) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS44, #2 Proposed Summons 4 Summonses)(Bailey, Jared) Modified text on 3/12/2021 (TNP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malcolm v. Florida Career College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookshire International Academy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Education Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer T. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Career College
Represented By: Jennifer T. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IEC U.S. Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer T. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Princess Malcolm
Represented By: Jared T. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?