Baptista v. Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Luiz Augusto Baptista
Defendant: Division Chief Lori Mackenzie, Chief Sarah Kendall, Attorney General US Merrick Garland, Secretary David Pekoske, Acting Director Tracy Renaud, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 6:2021cv00468
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/10/2021. (MEH) ctp
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/10/2021. (MEH) ctp
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Luiz Augusto Baptista. U.S. Attorney served on 3/18/2021, answer due 5/17/2021 (Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 3/23/2021 (SPM).
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 PROOF of service by Luiz Augusto Baptista. Attorney General of the United States served on 3/22/2021 (Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 3/23/2021 (SPM).
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF of service by Luiz Augusto Baptista. Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 3/19/2021 (Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 3/23/2021 (SPM).
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 PROOF of service by Luiz Augusto Baptista. Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/19/2021 (Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 3/23/2021 (SPM).
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 PROOF of service by Luiz Augusto Baptista. Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/19/2021 (Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 3/23/2021 (SPM).
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 PROOF of service by Luiz Augusto Baptista. Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/19/2021 (Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 3/23/2021 (SPM).
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Attorney General of the United States, Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, and U.S. Attorney. (SPM)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:21-cv-0468-CEM-EJK. (SJB)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17997333) filed by Luiz Augusto Baptista. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons (Kendall), #3 Proposed Summons (Mackenzie), #4 Proposed Summons (Renaud), #5 Proposed Summons (Pekoske), #6 Proposed Summons (Garland), #7 Proposed Summons (Hoppman))(Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 3/15/2021 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baptista v. Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division Chief Lori Mackenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Sarah Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General US Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary David Pekoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Tracy Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luiz Augusto Baptista
Represented By: Rusten C. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?