Muilenburg Holdings LLC v. Bank of America Corporation
Plaintiff: Muilenburg Holdings LLC
Defendant: Begcorp LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Bank of America Corporation
Case Number: 6:2021cv00487
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
2 Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/13/2021. (BIA)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration of Remand by Begcorp LLC. (Hecht, Adam)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This action is REMANDED to Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate all pending motions and close the file. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/18/2021. (BIA)
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel Adam Hecht that Form JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet is required for the Clerk of Court to initiate a civil docket sheet. File the Civil Cover Sheet in this action using the Notice (Other) event. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. New case number: 6:21-cv-00487-RBD-GJK. Judge Anne C. Conway no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of recusal. Clerk is directed to reassign the case. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 3/17/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL CASE ORDER for Plaintiff and Defendant Begcorp LLC - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 3/16/2021. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC)
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-487-ACC-GJK. (SJB)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida, case number 2020-CA-012656-O filed in State Court on March 16, 2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-18007733 filed by Begcorp LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 State Court Other Documents Appearance, #4 State Court Other Documents Motion for Extension of Time, #5 State Court Other Documents Motion to Release Account Records, #6 State Court Other Documents Cover Letter to Court, #7 State Court Other Documents Order Granting Additional Time, #8 State Court Other Documents Notice of Hearing, #9 State Court Other Documents Court Minutes, #10 State Court Other Documents Order on Motion to Release, #11 State Court ANSWER Bank of America Answer, #12 State Court Other Documents Summons to BegCorp, #13 State Court ANSWER Muilenburg Holdings LLC Answer, #14 State Court Other Documents Summons to BegCorp)(Hecht, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muilenburg Holdings LLC v. Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muilenburg Holdings LLC
Represented By: Adam Colby Losey
Represented By: Linnea Margaret Eberhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Begcorp LLC
Represented By: Adam Hecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Shannon Dobel
Represented By: Marc Thomas Parrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?