Bennett v. United States of America
Petitioner: Troy Bennett
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 6:2021cv00687
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 6:16-cr-256-CEM-EJK filed by Troy Bennett.(SPM)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend. The Clerk of the Court is directed to separately file and docket the attachment (Doc. 8-1) to the motion (Petitioner's Amended Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence). Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 6/3/2021. (DS)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend 28 USC 2255 To Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (not signed) by Troy Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Amended 2255 Motion to Vacate, #2 Mailing Envelope)(TNP)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File within thirty days from the date of this Order, Petitioner shall file an Amended Motion to Vacate on the appropriate section 2255 form, and it shall besigned by Petitioner himself or by an attorney admitted to practice in this Court. The failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Granting #6 Motion to Correct; striking 1 Motion to Vacate / Set Aside / Correct Sentence (2255). The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the Motion to Vacate as a pending motion, remove it from the record, and return it toPetitioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/11/2021. (DS)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Correct or, in the Alternative, Strike 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 6:16-cr-256-CEM-EJK by United States of America. (Gable, Karen) Modified text on 5/11/2021 (TNP).
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Gable, Karen)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File 2255 Motion for 45 days and or Amend/Correct Said Motion by Troy Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(TNP)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 4/26/2021. (DS)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appropriate Pleadings with Regard to a Motion under Rule 2255 by Troy Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(TNP)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 **STRICKEN AND REMOVED PER ORDER AT #7** MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 6:16-cr-256-CEM-EJK filed by Troy Bennett. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(TNP) Modified on 5/12/2021 (TNP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Troy Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Karen L. Gable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?