Securities and Exchange Commission v. Harbor City Capital Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Jonathan P. Maroney, HCC Media Funding, LLC, HCCF-5 LLC, HCCF-1 LLC, HCCF-3 LLC, Harbor City Capital Corp., Tonya L. Maroney, Harbor City Ventures, LLC, Celtic Enterprises, LLC, HCCF-4 LLC, Harbor City Digital Ventures, Inc. and HCCF-2 LLC
Case Number: 6:2021cv00694
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0077
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #59 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline to Apply for Default Judgments Pursuant to Local Rule 1.10(c). The SEC may file a motion for default judgment against the Corporate Defendants and Celtic but must do so no later than 14 days after the claims against Defendant Maroney have been resolved. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/17/2021. (RN) Modified on 6/17/2021 (RN).
June 16, 2021 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Receiver and Memorandum of Law by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Katherine C. Donlon, Esq., #2 Exhibit 2 - Guerra King, #3 Exhibit 3 - Buchanan Ingersoll)(Johnson, Alise) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
June 16, 2021 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File or Apply for Default Judgments Pursuant to Middle District Local Rule 1.10(c) by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Johnson, Alise)
June 8, 2021 Filing 58 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Johnson, Alise)
June 7, 2021 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #18 Order Case Management and Deadlines by Jonathan P. Maroney. (O'Mara, Mark)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER- Plaintiff's Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, and Other Injunctive Relief (Doc. 4) is GRANTED insofar as it seeks a preliminary injunction. The Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 6-1 at 3-12) is converted to a preliminary injunction and ADOPTED and made a part of this Order. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/19/2021. (MEH) ctp
May 19, 2021 Filing 55 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Harbor City Digital Ventures, Inc. (SPM)
May 19, 2021 Filing 54 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Harbor City Ventures, LLC (SPM)
May 19, 2021 Filing 53 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to HCCF-1 LLC (SPM)
May 19, 2021 Filing 52 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to HCCF-3 LLC (SPM)
May 19, 2021 Filing 51 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to HCCF-4 LLC (SPM)
May 19, 2021 Filing 50 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to HCCF-5 LLC (SPM)
May 19, 2021 Filing 49 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to HCC Media Funding, LLC (SPM)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ENDORSED ORDER granting #46 Motion for Clerk's Default. The Clerk is directed to enter default as to HCC Media Funding, LLC, HCCF-1 LLC, HCCF-3 LLC, HCCF-4 LLC, HCCF-5 LLC, Harbor City Digital Ventures, Inc., and Harbor City Ventures, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 5/19/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
May 19, 2021 Filing 47 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza: Evidentiary Hearing held on 5/19/2021. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble (MEH) ctp
May 19, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION for Clerk's Default against HCC Media Funding, LLC, HCCF-1 LLC, HCCF-3 LLC, HCCF-4 LLC, HCCF-5 LLC, Harbor City Digital Ventures, Inc., Harbor City Ventures, LLC by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Johnson, Alise) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
May 19, 2021 Filing 45 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Celtic Enterprises, LLC (SPM)
May 19, 2021 Filing 44 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Harbor City Capital Corp. (SPM)
May 19, 2021 Filing 43 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to HCCF-2 LLC (SPM)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ENDORSED ORDER granting #40 Motion for Clerk's Default. The Clerk is directed to enter default as to Celtic Enterprises, LLC, HCCF-2 LLC, and Harbor City Capital Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 5/19/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
May 19, 2021 Filing 41 DECLARATION/Consent of Tonya L. Maroney to Entry of Preliminary Injunction, To Continue Asset Freeze and Other Relief by Jonathan P. Maroney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(O'Mara, Mark) Modified on 5/19/2021 (SPM).
May 19, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Celtic Enterprises, LLC, HCCF-2 LLC, Harbor City Capital Corp. by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Johnson, Alise) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
May 18, 2021 Filing 39 DECLARATION/Consent of Jonathan P. Maroney to Entry of Preliminary Injunction, To Continue Asset Freeze and Other Relief by Jonathan P. Maroney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(O'Mara, Mark) Modified on 5/19/2021 (SPM).
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED ORDER extending #6 the Temporary Restraining Order issued by the Court on April 21, 2021, through and including Wednesday, May 19, 2021, for the good cause reasons stated on the record at the #36 May 12, 2021 hearing. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/12/2021. (VLC)
May 12, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE OF HEARING: Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/19/2021 at 12:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. The Court has reserved 1-hour for the hearing. (MEH) ctp
May 12, 2021 Filing 36 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 5/12/2021. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble (MEH) ctp
May 12, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Filing Consents by Jonathan P. Maroney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(O'Mara, Mark) Modified on 5/13/2021 (SPM).
May 11, 2021 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #18 Order Case Management and Deadlines by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Johnson, Alise)
May 11, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Securities and Exchange Commission. Related case(s): No (Johnson, Alise) Modified on 5/11/2021 (SPM).
May 11, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 5/12/2021 at 3:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. The parties shall call 866-434-5269 five minutes before the hearing is scheduled to begin. Access Code: 4420602. Security Code: 051221.(MEH) ctp
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #27 Unopposed Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order for the reasons stated on the record at the #29 May 5, 2021 Hearing. The #6 Temporary Restraining Order issued by the Court on April 21, 2021, and extended by #20 Order on April 27, 2021, is extended through and including Wednesday, May 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/5/2021. (VLC)
May 5, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE canceling Evidentiary Hearing hearing scheduled for 05/06/2021. (MEH) ctp
May 5, 2021 Filing 29 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 5/5/2021. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble (MEH) ctp
May 4, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF HEARING: re: #27 Unopposed Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Dated April 21, 2021 and Extended by this Court on April 27, 2021 and Request for Telephone Hearing . Telephone Conference set for 5/5/2021 at 2:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. The parties shall call 866-434-5269 five minutes before the hearing is scheduled to begin. Access Code: 4420602. Security Code: 050521. (MEH) ctp
May 4, 2021 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Dated April 21, 2021 and Extended by this Court on April 27, 2021 and Request for Telephone Hearing by Jonathan P. Maroney. (O'Mara, Mark) Modified on 5/4/2021 (SPM).
May 4, 2021 Filing 26 RETURN of service executed on 04/26/2021 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to HCCF-5 LLC. (Johnson, Alise)
May 4, 2021 Filing 25 RETURN of service executed on 04/26/2021 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to HCCF-4 LLC. (Johnson, Alise)
May 4, 2021 Filing 24 RETURN of service executed on 04/26/2021 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to HCCF-3 LLC. (Johnson, Alise)
May 4, 2021 Filing 23 RETURN of service executed on 04/26/2021 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to HCC Media Funding, LLC. (Johnson, Alise)
April 30, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark M. O'Mara on behalf of Jonathan P. Maroney (O'Mara, Mark)
April 27, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Evidentiary Hearing hearing previously scheduled for 04/29/2021 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/6/2021 at 2:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. The Court has reserved 1-hour for the hearing. (MEH) ctp
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER extending TRO through and including May 7, 2021, unless dissolved or extended for good cause by this Court. The preliminary injunction hearing is rescheduled to May 6, 2021, at 2:00 PM. Defendants are on notice that failure to appear at the hearing may result in the imposition of a preliminary injunction without further notice. Plaintiff shall continue its attempts to notify Defendant Jonathan P. Maroney of the TRO. Additionally, Plaintiff shall provide a copy of this Order to all Defendants. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/27/2021. (MEH) ctp
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/27/2021. (MEH) ctp
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/27/2021. (MEH) ctp
April 26, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE regarding Status of Service on Defendants by Securities and Exchange Commission (Johnson, Alise) Modified on 4/27/2021 (SPM).
April 26, 2021 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 04/23/2021 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Celtic Enterprises, LLC. (Johnson, Alise)
April 26, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 04/23/2021 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to HCCF-2 LLC. (Johnson, Alise)
April 26, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 04/26/2021 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to HCCF-1 LLC. (Johnson, Alise)
April 26, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 04/26/2021 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Harbor City Ventures, LLC. (Johnson, Alise)
April 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING: Evidentiary Hearing set for 4/29/2021 at 2:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. The Court will hear argument and the parties may present evidence. The Court has reserved 1-hour for the hearing. (MEH) ctp
April 26, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 04/26/2021 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Harbor City Digital Ventures, Inc.. (Johnson, Alise)
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 04/23/2021 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Harbor City Capital Corp.. (Johnson, Alise)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Lift the Seal and for the Court to Instruct the Clerk of Court to Place All Previously Filed Pleadings, Exhibits, and Orders on the Public Docket. The Clerk is directed to lift the seal on all documents in this case and file them on the public docket. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/26/2021. (SPM)
April 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Lift the Seal and for the Court to Instruct the Clerk of Court to Place All Previously Filed Pleadings, Exhibits, and Orders on the Public Docket by Securities and Exchange Commission. (SPM)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Celtic Enterprises, LLC, HCC Media Funding, LLC, HCCF-1 LLC, HCCF-2 LLC, HCCF-3 LLC, HCCF-4 LLC, HCCF-5 LLC, Harbor City Capital Corp., Harbor City Digital Ventures, Inc., Harbor City Ventures, LLC, Tonya L. Maroney, Jonathan P. Maroney. (SPM)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #4 Motion for Emergency Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, and Other Injunctive Relief. As soon as practicable, but no later than Friday, April 23, 2021, Plaintiff shall serve this Order on Defendants and thereafter file proof of service. Plaintiff and Defendants shall appear on Thursday, April 29, 2021, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5B, George C. Young United States Courthouse Annex, 401 W. Central Boulevard, Orlando, Florida, before the Honorable Carlos E. Mendoza. Defendants are on notice that failure to appear at the hearing may result in the imposition of a preliminary injunction without further notice. This Order shall remain in effect for fourteen days unless dissolved or extended for good cause by this Court. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Order) (SPM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing CERTIFICATE Pursuant to Rule 65(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Securities and Exchange Commission (SPM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 Emergency Ex Parte MOTION and Memorandum of Law for Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, and Other Injunctive Relief by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7,8,9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15,16,17, #15 Exhibit 18,19, #16 Exhibit 20,21, #17 Exhibit 22, #18 Exhibit 23, #19 Exhibit 24,25, #20 Exhibit 26,27, #21 Exhibit 28,29,30)(SPM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Its Emergency Ex Parte Motion and Memorandum of Law for Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, and other Injunctive Relief in Excess of the 25-Page Limit by Securities and Exchange Commission. (SPM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Securities and Exchange Commission. (SPM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Other Relief against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SPM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Harbor City Capital Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan P. Maroney
Represented By: Mark M. O'Mara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCC Media Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCCF-5 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCCF-1 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCCF-3 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor City Capital Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya L. Maroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor City Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celtic Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCCF-4 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor City Digital Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCCF-2 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Alise M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?