Schimming et al v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Plaintiff: Annette Schimming and Estate of Gerald Mielke
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Case Number: 6:2021cv01299
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: David A Baker
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Estate of Gerald Mielke, Annette Schimming. (Elias, Richard)
September 14, 2021 Filing 24 Member Case BRIEF by Estate of Gerald Mielke, Annette Schimming. (Elias, Richard) Modified text on 9/15/2021 (TNP).
September 14, 2021 Filing 23 BRIEF on Case Status in Schimming by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Johnston, Robert) Modified text on 9/15/2021 (TNP).
September 14, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Milton Elias on behalf of Estate of Gerald Mielke, Annette Schimming (Elias, Richard)
September 14, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawana Sue Wichmann on behalf of Annette Schimming (Wichmann, Lawana)
September 14, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Joe Gregory Hollingsworth on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Hollingsworth, Joe)
September 13, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Johnston on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Johnston, Robert)
September 13, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L. Reissaus on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Reissaus, Andrew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Hollingsworth on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Hollingsworth, Grant)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Status Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. All motions pending as of the date of this Order are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Parties seeking relief should renew any motions by refiling them in the individual member cases or in the lead case as appropriate. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/31/2021. Associated Cases: 6:21-md-03006-RBD-DAB et al.(BIA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2021: #1 Exhibit A) (BIA).
August 16, 2021 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A Baker per Order at Doc. 2 in case 6:21-md-3006-RBD-DAB. New case number: 6:21-cv-01299-RBD-DAB. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
August 16, 2021 Filing 14 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION member case. Master MDL case number: 3006 Receipt of original record from the Eastern District of Wisconsin, case number: 2:21-cv-00135-JPS. Assigned MDFL case number: 6:21-cv-01299-RBD-GJK. (ALL)
August 16, 2021 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00135. File received electronically
August 12, 2021 Filing 12 Certified Order to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida (cc: all counsel)(bx) [Transferred from wied on 8/16/2021.]
July 7, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #11 MOTION to Stay filed by Estate of Gerald Mielke, Annette Schimming ; Certain attachments (Brief in Support) to this document should have been filed as separate entries using a separate event Brief In Support. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx) [Transferred from wied on 8/16/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Wichmann in support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Wichmann, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Wichmann)(Curtis, Scott) [Transferred from wied on 8/16/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(bx) [Transferred from wied on 8/16/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION of Plaintiff for Transfer of Actions to the Southern District of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(bx) [Transferred from wied on 8/16/2021.]
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kelber, Tamar) [Transferred from wied on 8/16/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Curtis, Scott) [Transferred from wied on 8/16/2021.]
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Curtis, Scott) [Transferred from wied on 8/16/2021.]
March 8, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to All Parties requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 14 days; the form is available #here. (bx) [Transferred from wied on 8/16/2021.]
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Kelber, Tamar) [Transferred from wied on 8/16/2021.]
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Kelber, Tamar) [Transferred from wied on 8/16/2021.]
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamar B Kelber on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Tamar B. Kelber (Kelber, Tamar) [Transferred from wied on 8/16/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Estate of Gerald Mielke, Annette Schimming (Curtis, Scott) [Transferred from wied on 8/16/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation by Annette Schimming, Estate of Gerald Mielke. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3722277)(Curtis, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl). [Transferred from wied on 8/16/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Summons Issued as to Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (cmb) [Transferred from wied on 8/16/2021.]
February 3, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl) [Transferred from wied on 8/16/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schimming et al v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Schimming
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Lawana S. Wichmann
Represented By: Scott J Curtis
Represented By: Richard Milton Elias
Represented By: Lawana Sue Wichmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Gerald Mielke
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Lawana S. Wichmann
Represented By: Scott J Curtis
Represented By: Richard Milton Elias
Represented By: Lawana Sue Wichmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Tamar B. Kelber
Represented By: Joe Gregory Hollingsworth
Represented By: Andrew L. Reissaus
Represented By: Grant Hollingsworth
Represented By: Robert E. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?