Pederson v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Plaintiff: Curtis Pederson
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Case Number: 6:2021cv01300
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: David A Baker
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Curtis Pederson. (Silverman, Raymond)
September 24, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie H. Muhlstock on behalf of Curtis Pederson (Muhlstock, Melanie)
September 24, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison Macy Biggs on behalf of Curtis Pederson (Biggs, Harrison)
September 14, 2021 Filing 46 Member Case BRIEF by Curtis Pederson. (Silverman, Raymond) Modified text on 9/15/2021 (TNP).
September 14, 2021 Filing 45 BRIEF on Case Status in Pederson by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Johnston, Robert) Modified text on 9/15/2021 (TNP).
September 14, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond C. Silverman on behalf of Curtis Pederson (Silverman, Raymond)
September 14, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Carl Oxx on behalf of Curtis Pederson (Oxx, Christopher)
September 14, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Joe Gregory Hollingsworth on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Hollingsworth, Joe)
September 13, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Johnston on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Johnston, Robert)
September 13, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L. Reissaus on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Reissaus, Andrew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Hollingsworth on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Hollingsworth, Grant)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Status Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. All motions pending as of the date of this Order are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Parties seeking relief should renew any motions by refiling them in the individual member cases or in the lead case as appropriate. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/31/2021. Associated Cases: 6:21-md-03006-RBD-DAB et al.(BIA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2021: #1 Exhibit A) (BIA).
August 16, 2021 Filing 37 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A Baker per Order at Doc. 2 in case 6:21-md-3006-RBD-DAB. New case number: 6:21-cv-01300-RBD-DAB. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
August 16, 2021 Filing 36 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION member case. Master MDL case number: 3006 Receipt of original record from the Western District of Washington, case number: 3:20-cv-05216-RJB. Assigned MDFL case number: 6:21-cv-01300-RBD-GJK. (ALL)
August 16, 2021 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 3:20-cv-05216. File received electronically
August 12, 2021 Filing 34 MDL 3006 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 3006); in re Tasigna (Nilotinib) Products Liability Litigation; Middle District of Florida; assigned to Judge Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Email re CTO) (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Stay until 8/13/2021. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
July 9, 2021 Filing 32 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Curtis Pederson, TO RESPONSE to #29 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Grant Hollingsworth filed by Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation re #29 MOTION to Stay (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE, by Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, to #29 MOTION to Stay . (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Noting Date Set for 7/9/2021, re #29 MOTION to Stay. (AMD) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION to Stay , filed by Plaintiff Curtis Pederson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Silverman, Raymond) Noting Date 7/9/2021. Modified on 6/23/2021 (AMD). [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald B. Leighton retired from federal bench. (DK) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES ; Length of Trial: *15 DAYS*. Jury Trial is set for March 7, 2022 at 9:00 AM. Joinder of Parties due by 8/10/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/8/2021, Motions due by 10/18/2021, Discovery completed by 11/8/2021, Dispositive motions due by 12/7/2021, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 12/29/2021, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 2/1/2022, 39.1 Settlement Report due by 2/15/2022, Motions in Limine due by 1/31/2022, Pretrial Order due by 2/18/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2022 at 08:30 AM. Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/22/2022, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 2/22/2022. Authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 24 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 15. (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #22 Notice of Supplemental Authority, #20 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Curtis Pederson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #20 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Curtis Pederson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY, filed by Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, TO RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law in Support (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Curtis Pederson, to #10 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law in Support. (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Donald Robertson McMinn for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew L Reissaus for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert E Johnston for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Donald R. McMinn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6272486 (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew L. Reissaus FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6272479 (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert E. Johnston FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6272464 (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Campbell on behalf of Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Novartis Corporation, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Holding, AG, a Swiss company, Corporate Parent Novartis Finance Corporation, a New York Corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis GA, a Swiss Company for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Jennifer L. Campbell in Support of Defendant Novartis Corporation's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law in Support (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/8/2020, (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/15/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/22/2020, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation on 3/20/2020 (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Raymond C Silverman for Plaintiff Curtis Pederson, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (SP) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Raymond C. Silverman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Curtis Pederson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6226253 (Moore, Bradley) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS (Amended) by Plaintiff Curtis Pederson (Moore, Bradley) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (ERA) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 11, 2020 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (ERA) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # BWAWDC-6201588) Attorney Bradley Jerome Moore added to party Curtis Pederson(pty:pla), filed by Curtis Pederson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Moore, Bradley) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pederson v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Pederson
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Represented By: Bradley Jerome Moore
Represented By: Christopher Carl Oxx
Represented By: Harrison Macy Biggs
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Andrew L. Reissaus
Represented By: Donald R. McMinn
Represented By: Robert E. Johnston
Represented By: Jennifer Campbell
Represented By: Joe Gregory Hollingsworth
Represented By: Grant Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?