Lindberg v. Oaks et al
Plaintiff: Lena Marie Lindberg
Defendant: Kevin Oaks, Joe Pinsker, James Adams, Ralph Garcia, Shadrick Carter, Will Newman, Lisa German, Jerrod Gerwig, John Barberi, John Doe and Mathew Stonequist
Case Number: 6:2021cv01417
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend #7 Amended Complaint by Lena Marie Lindberg. (LAB)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to strike re: 13 Notice (Other) filed by Lena Marie Lindberg, 10 Supplement filed by Lena Marie Lindberg. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/20/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
October 14, 2021 Filing 13 (STRICKEN and REMOVED per Order #14) NOTICE of filing proposed orders by Lena Marie Lindberg (HAI) Modified text on 10/20/2021 (LDJ).
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to strike re: 9 Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/14/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing, Proof of Service, and copy of Petition for Writ of Certiorari submitted to the Supreme Court on 7/12/2021 by Lena Marie Lindberg (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(RLK)
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 (STRICKEN and REMOVED per Order #14) SUPPLEMENT re #7 Amended Complaint by Lena Marie Lindberg. (LAB) Modified text on 10/20/2021 (LDJ).
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 (STRICKEN and REMOVED per Order #12) UNILATERAL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (HAI) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (LDJ). Modified text on 10/14/2021 (LDJ).
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Lena Marie Lindberg. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lena Marie Lindberg. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Lena Marie Lindberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(HAI)
September 17, 2021 Set deadline: Amended Complaint due by 10/1/2021 (LDJ)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency filed by Lena Marie Lindberg. The Complaint (Doc. 1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Friday, October 1, 2021, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint correcting the deficiencies identified in the R&R and an amended motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to timely file will result in this action being closed without further notice. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/17/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO SE ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/31/2021. (BIA) (CTP)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/31/2021. (BIA) (CTP)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency filed by Lena Marie Lindberg. It is RECOMMENDED that the Court: 1. DENY the Motion (Doc. No. 2); 2. DISMISS the complaint without prejudice; and 3. Grant Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within a time established by the Court along with an amended motion to proceed in forma pauperis, with the warning that failure to file an amended complaint within the time permitted by the Court will result in dismissal of the case without further notice. See Report and Recommendation for additional details. A party has fourteen days from this date to file written objections to the Report and Recommendation's factual findings and legal conclusions. Failure to file written objections waives that party's right to challenge on appeal any unobjected-to factual finding or legal conclusion the district judge adopts from the Report and Recommendation. 11th Cir. R. 3-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/31/2021. (MB)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Lena Marie Lindberg. (LDJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lena Marie Lindberg.(LDJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindberg v. Oaks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Marie Lindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Pinsker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shadrick Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerrod Gerwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Barberi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Stonequist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?