Collage Design & Construction Group, Inc. v. RNB Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Collage Design & Construction Group, Inc.
Defendant: RNB Construction, Inc. and Razvan Puha
Case Number: 6:2021cv01572
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay. Case is stayed pending completion of arbitration. Defendant is directed to file a status report by 3/1/22 and every 3 months thereafter. Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and administratively close the file. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 11/15/2021. (counsel mailed/emailed) (AKC)
November 12, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Mandatory Arbitration & Concurrence in Request for Order Staying Case Pending Arbitration filed by Collage Design & Construction Group, Inc.. (Hayes, Rosemary)
November 11, 2021 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT and Request for a Case Management Conference (filed unilaterally). (Early, Steven) Modified on 11/12/2021 (RDO).
November 11, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Razvan Puha, RNB Construction, Inc.. (Early, Steven)
November 11, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Razvan Puha, RNB Construction, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Early, Steven)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION AT DOC. #10 #10. The response is due by 11/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 11/10/2021. (MB)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Mandatory Arbitration by Collage Design & Construction Group, Inc.. (Hayes, Rosemary) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Mandatory Arbitration by All Defendants. (Early, Steven)
October 11, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Collage Design & Construction Group, Inc.. (Hayes, Rosemary)
October 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Collage Design & Construction Group, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Hayes, Rosemary)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Discovery Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/28/2021. (MB)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (RDO)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 9/27/2021. (Counsel emailed)(AKC)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-1572-ACC-GJK. (NAS)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Collage Design & Construction Group, Inc.. (Hayes, Rosemary)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Collage Design & Construction Group, Inc.. (Hayes, Rosemary)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BFLMDC-18744913) filed by Collage Design & Construction Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - 2019 12 19 59400 RNB Executed Subcontract, #3 Exhibit 2 - 2021 05 25 59400 RNB and Puha Personal Guarantee, #4 Exhibit 3 - 2021 05 25 59400 RNB Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit 4 - 2021 05 26 UCC FL - RNB and Puha, #6 Exhibit 5 - 2021 09 02 UCC GA - RNB and Puha, #7 Exhibit 6 - 2021 09 15 RNB Hyatt Response Letter)(Hayes, Rosemary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collage Design & Construction Group, Inc. v. RNB Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collage Design & Construction Group, Inc.
Represented By: Rosemary Hanna Hayes
Represented By: Carly Marie Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RNB Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Gregory Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Razvan Puha
Represented By: Steven Gregory Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?