Diaz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Maria Jeannette Diaz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2021cv01580
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF of service by Maria Jeannette Diaz as to Office of Regional Chief Counsel on 10/12/2021. (SPM)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF of service by Maria Jeannette Diaz as to Attorney General on 10/15/2021. (SPM)
October 25, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Maria Jeannette Diaz. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/5/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (SPM)
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (SPM)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Maria Jeannette Diaz. (Culbertson, Richard)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/28/2021. (MB)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER: Parties have 14 days from the date of this Order to file their Disclosure Statement (if not already filed) and, additionally to notify the Court of a related action by filing a Notice of Related Action, Local Rule 1.07(c), that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District of Florida or elsewhere (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 9/28/2021. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copies mailed/emailed) (AKC)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (SPM)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-1580-GKS-GJK. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (MLJ)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Patience Jacobs on behalf of Maria Jeannette Diaz (Jacobs, Sarah)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Maria Jeannette Diaz. (Culbertson, Richard)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Maria Jeannette Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Appendix Marshals Forms)(Culbertson, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Jeannette Diaz
Represented By: Sarah Patience Jacobs
Represented By: Richard A. Culbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?