Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 71.43.172.50
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 71.43.172.50
Case Number: 6:2021cv01581
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/19/2021. (RN)
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Legal Authority by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wang, Yetian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 10/19/2021 (LDJ).
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 Remark: Doc. #10 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/6/2021. (LLM)
October 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Wang, Yetian)
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Wang, Yetian)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/30/2021. (BIA)(ctp)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/1/2021. (RN)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (LDJ)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 Remark: Doc. #2 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/28/2021. (LLM)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wang, Yetian)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:21-cv-1581-RBD-DCI. (SJB)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Wang, Yetian)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Wang, Yetian)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 71.43.172.50 with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18751424) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wang, Yetian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 71.43.172.50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Yetian Wang
Represented By: Tyler Mamone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 71.43.172.50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?