McMahon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Stephen Michael McMahon
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2021cv01582
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Laura Lothman Lambert
2 Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 22 CASE Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 6:21-cv-1582-CEM-LLL. Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt no longer assigned to the case. (LRB)
November 1, 2021 Filing 21 PROOF of service by Stephen Michael McMahon as to the Office of Regional Chief Counsel on 10/21/2021. (SPM)
November 1, 2021 Filing 20 PROOF of service by Stephen Michael McMahon as to the Attorney General on 10/22/2021. (SPM)
November 1, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS returned executed by Stephen Michael McMahon. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/14/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (SPM)
October 14, 2021 Filing 18 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 6:21-cv-1582-CEM-JRK. Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman no longer assigned to the case. (NAS)
October 6, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (SPM)
October 6, 2021 Filing 16 US Marshal 285 form for Service to US Attorney for the Middle District of Florida. (Fugate, Shea)
October 6, 2021 Filing 15 US Marshal 285 form for Service to the Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (Fugate, Shea)
October 6, 2021 Filing 14 US Marshal 285 form for Service to the Attorney General of the USA. (Fugate, Shea)
October 6, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Stephen Michael McMahon. (Fugate, Shea)
October 6, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Stephen Michael McMahon. (Fugate, Shea)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Stephen Michael McMahon. (Fugate, Shea)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
October 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Stephen Michael McMahon. Related case(s): No (Fugate, Shea)
October 6, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order by Stephen Michael McMahon. (Fugate, Shea)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Counsel for Plaintiff shall obtain the appropriate summonses and Marshal 285 forms from the Court's website, and complete and return them to the Clerk of Court on or before October 11, 2021. Once the completed summonses are returned to the Court, the Clerk is directed to provide the completed service forms to the United States Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 9/28/2021. (MKH)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/28/2021. (MEH) ctp
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/28/2021. (MEH) ctp
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (SPM)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:21-cv-1582-CEM-LRH. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (LMW)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Stephen Michael McMahon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Fugate, Shea)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Stephen Michael McMahon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fugate, Shea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMahon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Michael McMahon
Represented By: Shea A. Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?