Lemay v. Magical Cruise Company Limited et al
Plaintiff: Delores Lemay
Defendant: Magical Cruise Company Limited d/b/a Disney Cruise Line, John Cassidy d/b/a John Cassidy Entertainment, Magical Cruise Company Limited a Florida corporation doing business as Disney Cruise Line and John Cassidy a Pennsylvania resident doing business as John Cassidy Entertainment
Case Number: 6:2021cv01601
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Delores Lemay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Parrish, Philip)
November 5, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by John Cassidy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Marichal, Carlo) Modified text on 11/8/2021 (TNP).
October 28, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Delores Lemay. (Parrish, Philip)
October 13, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Delores Lemay. Related case(s): No (Holzberg, Glenn)
October 13, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Delores Lemay. (Holzberg, Glenn)
October 13, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of a related action (None) per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Magical Cruise Company Limited. Related case(s): No (Hamilton, Jerry)
October 13, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by Magical Cruise Company Limited. (Hamilton, Jerry)
October 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Dean Hamilton on behalf of Magical Cruise Company Limited (Hamilton, Jerry)
October 12, 2021 Filing 13 Entered in Error -(AKC).
October 11, 2021 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by John Cassidy.(Marichal, Carlo)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip D. Parrish on behalf of Delores Lemay (Parrish, Philip)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL CASE ORDER for Defendant Magical Cruise Company Limited - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 10/1/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
September 30, 2021 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Perfect Service of Process on Defendant John Cassidy by John Cassidy. (Marichal, Carlo) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 10/1/2021 (MEJ).
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Magical Cruise Discovery by John Cassidy. (Marichal, Carlo) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified text on 10/1/2021 (MEJ).
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel Glenn J. Holzberg of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Discovery Order. See Order for details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/30/2021. (KRR)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by John Cassidy d/b/a John Cassidy Entertainment. Related case(s): No (Marichal, Carlo) Modified text on 9/30/2021 (MEJ).
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by John Cassidy d/b/a John Cassidy Entertainment. (Marichal, Carlo) Modified to link order on 9/30/2021 (MEJ).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL CASE ORDER for both Plaintiff and Defendant John Cassidy - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 9/29/2021. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-1601-ACC-GJK. (LMW)
September 29, 2021 FEE PAID. Filing fee for new civil case, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18763113 for $402 paid. (Marichal, Carlo)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th Judicial Circuit in and for Brevard County, case number 05-2020-CA-034486-XXXX-XX filed in State Court on 7/13/2020. filed by John Cassidy d/b/a John Cassidy Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Lemay Complaint, #2 State Court ANSWER Magical Answer, #3 State Court Docket Sheet Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents all other documents combined, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Marichal, Carlo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemay v. Magical Cruise Company Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Lemay
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Represented By: Louis Maxwell Holzberg
Represented By: Philip D. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magical Cruise Company Limited d/b/a Disney Cruise Line
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cassidy d/b/a John Cassidy Entertainment
Represented By: Carlo D. Marichal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magical Cruise Company Limited a Florida corporation doing business as Disney Cruise Line
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Martin
Represented By: Jerry Dean Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cassidy a Pennsylvania resident doing business as John Cassidy Entertainment
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Bell
Represented By: Carlo D. Marichal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?