McNeil v. 1508 LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael R. McNeil
Defendant: 1508 LLC and HC Cigars Daytona LLC doing business as Don Kiki Cigar Superstore
Case Number: 6:2021cv01612
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Solely As To Defendant HC Cigars Daytona LLC solely by Michael R. McNeil. (Quick, Joe) Modified on 11/24/2021 (RDO).
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER dismissing case re #12 Notice of settlement. All pending motions are denied as moot and the clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 11/1/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
October 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of settlement Solely As To Defendant HC Cigars Daytona LLC by Michael R. McNeil (Quick, Joe)
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 Entered in error. (AKC)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER dismissing case against defendant 1508 LLC only - re #9 Notice of settlement. Clerk is directed to terminate them as a party. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 10/26/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of settlement Solely As To Defendant 1508 LLC by Michael R. McNeil (Quick, Joe)
October 17, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order by Michael R. McNeil. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Case List)(Quick, Joe)
October 3, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Michael R. McNeil. (Quick, Joe)
October 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Michael R. McNeil. Related case(s): No (Quick, Joe)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ADA SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Answers to Interrogatories due within 15 days. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 10/1/2021. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (RDO)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL CASE ORDER (ADA waiving CMR requirement at this time) - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 9/30/2021. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:21-cv-1612-ACC-LRH. (SJB)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18763962) filed by Michael R. McNeil. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons 1508 LLC, #3 Proposed Summons HC Cigars Daytona LLC)(Quick, Joe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeil v. 1508 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. McNeil
Represented By: Joe M. Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1508 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HC Cigars Daytona LLC doing business as Don Kiki Cigar Superstore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?