Fisher v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tracy Ann Fisher
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2021cv01736
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF of service by Tracy Ann Fisher (Avard, Carol)
November 11, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Tracy Ann Fisher. United States Attorney served on 11/3/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (Avard, Carol)
November 10, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF of service by Tracy Ann Fisher (Avard, Carol)
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 Remark: Doc. #8 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/28/2021. (LLM)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE statement re #6 Order pdf by Tracy Ann Fisher. (Avard, Carol) Modified on 10/27/2021 (matched text to pleading) (KNC).
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Tracy Ann Fisher. Related case(s): No (Avard, Carol)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/25/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (SPM)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (SPM)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:21-cv-1736-RBD-EJK. (SJB)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18829847) filed by Tracy Ann Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Avard, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Ann Fisher
Represented By: Carol Ann Avard
Represented By: Mark V. Zakhvatayev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?