Soistman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Edward James Soistman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2021cv01761
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF of service as to the Office of the Attorney General by Edward James Soistman (Berger, Erik) Modified text on 11/23/2021 (ARJ).
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF of service as to the Office of Regional Counsel by Edward James Soistman (Berger, Erik) Modified text on 11/23/2021 (ARJ).
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Edward James Soistman. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (Berger, Erik)
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER: Parties have 14 days from the date of this Order to file their Disclosure Statement (if not already filed - Plaintiff complied at Doc. No. #2) and, additionally to notify the Court of a related action by filing a Notice of Related Action, Local Rule 1.07(c), that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District of Florida or elsewhere (not required if there are no related actions - Plaintiff complied at #3). Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 10/21/2021. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copies mailed/emailed) (AKC)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ARJ)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 07/23/2010. (ARJ)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-1761-GKS-GJK. (SJB)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Edward James Soistman. Related case(s): No (Berger, Erik)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Edward James Soistman. (Berger, Erik)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18841014) filed by Edward James Soistman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Berger, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soistman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward James Soistman
Represented By: Erik William Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?